Jasmine White v. RBD Staffing, Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-08519 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 27, 2016 2:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
RBD Staffing, Inc. dba SalesMakers
|
|
Defendant
RBD Staffing, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sprint/United Management Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine White
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Terminated: 02/26/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
58 | 58
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 07/19 7:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS-REOPENING/CLOSING by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Case should have been closed on entry dated July 11, 2017 (Doc. 57). Make JS-6. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
57 | 57
order
Settlement Attorney Fees
Wed 07/12 3:59 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers): Order GRANTING the Motions for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and Class Representative Incentive Award51 ,52 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Plaintiff's motion for final approval of class settlement and motion for attorneys' fees, costs, and incentive awards are GRANTED. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: (1) The Court approves settlement of the action between Plaintiff and Defendants, as set forth in the Settlement Agreement as fair, just, reasonable and adequate. The parties are directed to perform their settlement in accordance with the terms set forth in the Settlement Agreement. (2) Class Counsel is awarded $175,000 in attorneys fees and $3,723.06 in costs.Additionally, Plaintiff is awarded a $5,000 incentive award. The Court finds that these amounts are warranted and reasonable for the reasons set forth in the moving papersbefore the Court and the reasons stated in this Order. 3. The Court approves payment in the amount of $73,000 to CPT Group for settlement administration costs. (4) CPT Group is authorized to disburse funds pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement and this Order. (5) Without affecting the finality of this judgment in any way, this Court hereby retains exclusive jurisdiction over Defendants and the Settlement Class Members for all matters relating to the Litigation, including the administration, interpretation, effectuation, or enforcement of the Settlement Agreement and this Order. (jp) |