Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Tracey N Wise
Case #: 7:15-bk-70730
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Nov 21, 2016
Claims Deadline:Feb 21, 2017
Converted:Oct 19, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fortress Resources, LLC
PO Box 247
Wise, VA 24293-0247
Represented By
W Thomas Bunch, II
contact info
Peter Brackney
contact info
Bunch & Brock
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Michael J. Roeschenthaler
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info
James R. Irving
contact info
Trustee
J. Clair Edwards
PO Box 388
Somerset, KY 42502
Represented By
T. Kent Barber
Barber Law PLLC
contact info
Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP
contact info
James R. Irving
contact info
April A Wimberg
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
100 E Vine St #500
Lexington, KY 40507
Represented By
Bradley M. Nerderman
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2018 11:03 PM EST
Thursday, November 05, 2015
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 7:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - case upload 15-70730 [caseupld,1032u] (1717.00). Receipt number 8048189, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 112 pgs caseupld Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (fee) - Case Upload Thu 7:07 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $1717 filed by W Thomas Bunch II on behalf of Fortress Resources, LLC. (Bunch, W)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Thu 7:22 PM
Notice of Filing of of Additional Pages to Original Petition Filed by Fortress Resources, LLC Related [+]. (Bunch, W)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition - case upload filed by Debtor Fortress Resources, LLC
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document Pages to Schedule B-29 (Insert after Page 17 of Petition)
3 3 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 7:30 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , filed by Fortress Resources, LLC. (Bunch, W)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Resolution Thu 7:33 PM
Corporate Resolution, filed by Fortress Resources, LLC. (Bunch, W)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Order Submitted(BK-Aty) Thu 7:34 PM
Proposed Order submitted by W Thomas Bunch II Related [+]. (Bunch, W)
Related: [-] 4 Corporate Resolution filed by Debtor Fortress Resources, LLC
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 7:37 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement, filed by Fortress Resources, LLC. Corporate parents added to case:Opes Resources, Inc... (Bunch, W)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Thu 8:01 PM
Application to Employ W. Thomas Bunch II and other attorneys at Bunch & Brock as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession. Last day to file objections: 11/19/2015. (Bunch, W)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document Exhibit A - Affidavit of W. Thomas Bunch II
Att: 2 Proposed Order