Blizzard Entertainment Inc v. James Enright et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01840 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday May 07, 2016 3:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
James Enright
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blizzard Entertainment Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 30, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail
Thu 04/30 1:12 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE)(AO 121),12 e-mailed to Daniel Kohler bounced due to The email address you entered couldn't be found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Wed 04/29 12:29 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (twdb) |
|
Att: 1 attachment | ||
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 03/11 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment Inc. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Mayer, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/09 11:46 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Prosecution by Judge David O. Carter: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than March 16, 2016 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. See document for further information. (lwag) |
|
Thursday, November 12, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 11/12 9:50 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 11/10 11:25 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lwag) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 11/10 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lwag) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/10 11:24 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant James Enright. (lwag) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Mon 11/09 5:12 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 11/09 5:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., identifying Activision Blizzard, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 11/09 5:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 11/09 5:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Mayer, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 11/09 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16757724 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attorney Marc Ellis Mayer added to party Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mayer, Marc) |