Biggs v. Ferrero
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-02307 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Defendant
John D. Ferrero
|
|
Plaintiff
Jay Lewis Biggs
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Appeal Remark
Tue 06/19 1:27 PM
Appeal Order from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied re20 (No. 17-8535 (C,KA) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Appeal Remark
Mon 04/23 1:27 PM
Appeal Remark from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 2/16/18 and placed on the docket 4/18/18 as No. 17-8535 (H,SP) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 12/22 12:51 PM
True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's judgment re16 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 17-3469 . Date issued as mandate 12/21/17, Costs: None (H,SP) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
appeal
Acknowledgment from the USCA
Fri 05/05 5:29 PM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of16 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 17-3469 . Date filed in USCA 5/4/17. (H,SP) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Wed 04/26 8:14 AM
Designation of Record on Appeal (Statement and Praecipe) filed by Jay Lewis Biggs re16 Notice of Appeal (H,SP) |
|
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 04/26 8:12 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the15 Judgment Entry of 3/24/17, filed by Jay Lewis Biggs. Filing fee not paid. (H,SP) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment Entry, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of timely filing, | ||
Att: 3 IFP Application (IFP granted for appeal in Judgment Entry) | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Fri 03/24 2:56 PM
Judgment Entry: This case is dismissed. The Court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could be taken in good faith. . Judge Sara Lioi on 3/24/2017. (P,J) |
|
14 | 14
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Fri 03/24 2:51 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. No.7 ) is granted. The Court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could be taken in good faith. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No.12 ) is rendered moot by this ruling. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/24/2017. (P,J) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Fri 03/24 2:58 PM
Copy of14 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and15 Judgment Entry mailed on 3/24/2017 to: Jay Lewis Biggs, #560-289, T.O.C.I., P.O. Box 80033, Toledo, OH 43608. (P,J) |
||
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Wed 07/27 11:57 AM
Order: The Court expressly suspends briefing on plaintiff's dispositive motion until further order. (Doc. No.12 .) The Court intends to resolve the motion to dismiss first (Doc. No.7 ) and, should the case survive, it will then order a deadline for response and reply regarding the motion for summary judgment. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/27/2016. (P,J) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Wed 07/27 12:01 PM
Copy of13 Order mailed on 7/27/2016 to: Jay Lewis Biggs, #560-289, T.O.C.I., P.O. Box 80033, Toledo, OH 43608. (P,J) |
||
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 07/26 11:46 AM
Motion for summary judgment filed by Plaintiff Jay Lewis Biggs.(M,TL) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K | ||
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
resp
Reply
Fri 05/13 12:08 PM
Reply to response to7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by John D. Ferrero. (Babik, Stephan) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Address Change Notice
Wed 05/04 2:40 PM
Notice of Change of Address to Defendant filed by Jay Lewis Biggs. Related document3 .(M,TL) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
resp
Opposition
Fri 04/29 3:25 PM
Opposition to Defendant's7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Jay Lewis Biggs. (M,TL) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order
Fri 04/08 9:19 AM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/8/2016. (P,J) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Fri 04/08 9:20 AM
Copy of8 Initial Standing Order mailed on 4/8/2016 to: Jay Lewis Biggs, #560-289, T.O.C.I., P.O. Box 80033, Toledo, OH 43608. (P,J) |
||
Thursday, April 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/07 3:02 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant John D. Ferrero.(Babik, Stephan) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Motion to Release Biological Samples (filed with state trial court), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Judgment Entry Denying Motion to Release Biological Samples (by state trial court) | ||
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service Executed
Wed 04/06 8:39 AM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by certified mail executed upon John D. Ferrero on 3/28/2016, filed on behalf of Jay Lewis Biggs. Related document5 . (M,TL) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Tue 03/22 3:54 PM
Original Summons issued to US Marshal for service upon John D. Ferrero on 3/22/16. (M,TL) (M,TL) |
|
Att: 1 (3/22/2016) Issued Summons | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Tue 03/22 12:00 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis . The total filing fee in the amount of $350 is due. An initial partial fee in the amount of $20.30 is due and should be deducted from plaintiff's prisoner account, when funds are available therein, until the initial partial fee is paid. Thereafter, the prison cashier's office shall deduct, and forward to the Court, 20% of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the full $350 fee has been paid. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 3/22/2016.(D,I) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions for payment | ||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 03/22 12:11 PM
Copy of4 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, mailed to Jay Lewis Biggs #560-289 and Prison Cashier at T.O.C.I. at P.O. Box 80033, Toledo, OH 43608 on 3/22/2016. Copy also provided to Court's finance office on 3/22/2016. Related document(s)4 . (D,I) |
||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 03/22 4:02 PM
Copy of5 Summons Issued mailed to Jay Lewis Biggs #560-289, T.O.C.I., P.O. Box 80033, Toledo, OH 43608 on 03/22/2016. (M,TL) |
||
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Address Change Notice
Mon 11/30 4:31 PM
Address Change Notice filed by Jay Lewis Biggs. (M,TL) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/10 2:34 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jay Lewis Biggs.(H,KR) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Prisoner | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/10 2:28 PM
Complaint against John D. Ferrero. Filing fee not paid, motion IFP submitted, filed by Jay Lewis Biggs. (H,KR) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 U.S. Marshal Form | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Tue 11/10 2:31 PM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (H,KR) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/10 2:32 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (H,KR) |