New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert B Kugler
Referred: Joel Schneider
Case #: 1:15-cv-08020
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2015
Terminated:Jul 01, 2019
Last checked: Monday May 09, 2016 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.
Defendant
DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC.
Defendant
DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.
Defendant
FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.
Defendant
Forest Laboratories, LLC,
In Re
BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
LINDA WEATHERFORD
Represented By
DAVID C. DEGREEFF
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/05/2021 11:59 PM EST
Monday, July 01, 2019
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 07/01 3:57 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Closed Mon 07/01 3:57 PM
Member Case Closed on 7/1/2019 for MDL 2606. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 06/28 8:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., Forest Laboratories, LLC,. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
3 3 order Order Tue 01/19 3:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 19. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02606-RBK-JS et al.(TH, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2015
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/12 1:33 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAIME KASSELMAN* (jbk, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/12 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., Forest Laboratories, LLC, ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6751802) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LINDA WEATHERFORD.(jbk, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet