Kovach v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-04111 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 11, 2016 4:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Prudential Insurance Company of America, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Kovach
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 08/04 4:25 PM
JUDGMENT(kt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/03 2:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 08/03/2016. (TJB) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/03 10:08 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Diane Kovach. Jointly Signed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Settlement Conference
Sat 07/30 10:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Early Settlement Conference held on 7/28/2016. Settlement reached. (KMM) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 4:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher M. Busey for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/19/2016. (JLW) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Tue 07/19 2:56 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher M. Busey. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5024364 by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Lisle, Erin) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Wed 04/20 3:26 PM
AMENDED ORDER FOR EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/28/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/20/2016. (MMP) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice - WMW Practice Pointers
Wed 03/23 1:54 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers. (LEG) |
||
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Mon 02/29 5:10 PM
ORDER FOR EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/10/2016 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/29/2016. (lmb) |
|
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 02/29 5:09 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2016. Motions (disp) due by 11/1/2016. Ready for trial due by 2/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/29/2016. (lmb) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 02/29 4:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 2/29/2016. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (lmb) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 02/22 1:02 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Diane Kovach. Jointly Signed by PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(Operana, Brandon) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Fri 02/19 2:04 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The . (Lisle, Erin) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Attorney - WMW Case Reassigned
Thu 02/18 3:00 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Joan N. Ericksen is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 15-cv-4111 WMW/TNL . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/14 11:56 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ada W. Dolph for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/14/2016. (JLW) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/12 4:19 PM
NOTICE/ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/29/2016 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/12/2016.(JAM) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
7 | 7
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/12 2:52 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Prudential Financial, Inc. Prudential Financial, Inc. is a publicly traded company, and no parent corporation or any publicly-held corporation owns 10 percent or more of its stock. (Lisle, Erin) Modified text on 1/12/2016 (lmb) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/12 2:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Lisle, Erin) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Tue 01/12 2:49 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ada W. Dolph. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-4728232 by Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (Lisle, Erin) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 11/16 3:06 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael J. Davis recused. Case reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 15-cv-4111 (JNE/TNL) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/16/2015. (lmb) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/13 2:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America, The. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 11/13 2:22 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 15-cv-4111 MJD/TNL. (kt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/13 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4651353.) Filed by Diane Kovach. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |