Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc. v. Agrinomix, Inc.
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Butler, Jr |
Referred: | Katherine P Nelson |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00579 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:145 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday May 14, 2016 5:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Agrinomix, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 18, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Clerks Notice of Closing
Wed 05/18 11:52 AM
Clerk's Notice of Closing pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) re:21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. (sdb) |
|
utility
Document Referred
Wed 05/18 8:46 AM
REFERRAL OF21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Butler. (sdb) |
||
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 05/17 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc. (Adams, James) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
discov
Notice of Filing Discovery
Thu 04/21 10:29 AM
Notice of Filing Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery filed by Agrinomix, Inc.. |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/15 11:01 AM
ORDER on18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/15/2016. (meh) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/14 5:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc.. (Adams, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Staying Discovery ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 03/08 2:13 PM
ORDER granting15 Joint MOTION to stay the preliminary scheduling order. The current preliminary scheduling order (Doc.12 ) is VACATED. All discovery in this action is STAYED except as further set out. All jurisdictional discovery must be completed 5/10/2016. Plaintiff must file a supplemental response brief to the pending7 Motion to Dismiss by 5/17/2016. The Defendant must file any reply to the Plaintiff's supplemental brief by 5/24/2016. Plaintiff is ordered to file a disclosure statement by 3/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 3/8/2016. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 03/08 8:09 AM
Order. The pleadings and evidence currently before the Court are insufficient to establish personal jurisdiction over defendant Agrinomix in this district. The Court will withhold ruling on the motion to dismiss until Plaintiff has had an opportunity to conduct jurisdictional discovery. This matter shall be referred to the Magistrate Judge for the entry of an order setting a schedule for (1) discovery limited to the issue of specific jurisdiction and (2) supplemental briefs. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 3/7/2016. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 03/07 11:04 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (to Extend Deadlines) by Agrinomix, Inc.. |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 03/07 11:44 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (to Extend Deadlines) Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (sdb) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply Brief
Mon 02/22 5:03 PM
REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Agrinomix, Inc. re:8 Brief,7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,13 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Agrinomix, Inc.. |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
utility
Document Referred
Wed 02/17 11:43 AM
REFERRAL OF13 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Butler. (sdb) |
||
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 02/16 3:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc.. (Adams, James) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, February 03, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Preliminary Scheduling Order
Wed 02/03 1:39 PM
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/3/2016. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/03 1:08 PM
ORDER on9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Agrinomix, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/3/2016. (meh) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing
Wed 02/03 11:12 AM
Order Setting Motion Deadline re:7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Agrinomix, Inc.. Responses due by 2/16/2016. Replies due by 2/23/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 2/3/2016. copies to parties. (sdb) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/02 3:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Agrinomix, Inc., Robert Lando identifying Other Affiliate Robert Lando for Agrinomix, Inc... |
|
8 | 8
respm
Brief
Tue 02/02 1:36 PM
Brief filed by Agrinomix, Inc. re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Agrinomix, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 02/02 1:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Agrinomix, Inc.. |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 01/08 9:23 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due by 2/3/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 1/8/2016. (aen) |
|
answer
Answer due deadline
Mon 01/11 12:25 PM
Answer due from Agrinomix, Inc. on 2/3/2016. (sdb) |
||
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 01/07 4:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Agrinomix, Inc.. |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/22 2:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Agrinomix, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (sdb) |
|
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons
Mon 12/21 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc. (Adams, James) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Thu 11/19 9:15 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Agrinomix, Inc and Rob Lando on 11 16-2015 by Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 12/16/2015. (Adams, James) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/16 12:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Agrinomix, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-1825361, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mitchell Ellis Products, Inc.. (Adams, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Granted patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ellis machines, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Infringing machines |