Allen v. Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-03684 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday May 14, 2016 4:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Carrie Wright
|
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Allen
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit
Terminated: 05/02/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tennille Gavin
Terminated: 05/02/2016
Dallas County Child Protective Services 5351 Samuell Blvd
Dallas, TX 75228 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dawn M. Johnson
Terminated: 05/02/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, June 13, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Mon 06/13 5:00 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ordered that Plaintiff Patricia Allen take nothingon her claims against the defendants. The claims against Wright are dismissed without prejudice. The claims against Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Johnson, and Gavin are dismissed with prejudice. Court costs are taxed against Allen. All relief not expressly granted is denied. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/13/2016) (ykp) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Mon 06/13 4:57 PM
Order: On 5/2/2016, the Court issued an order requiring Plaintiff Patricia Allen to show cause within thirty (30) days why the action against Defendant Carrie Wright should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. To date, Allen has not responded. The Court therefore dismisses the claims against Wright without prejudice for want of prosecution. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/13/2016) (ykp) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Mon 05/02 3:02 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ordered pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order Allen show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failing to effect service. If the Court does not receive a satisfactory response within the amount of time specified, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice by authority of Rule 4(m). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/2/2016) (sss) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 05/02 3:01 PM
ORDER: This Order addresses Defendants Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit of the Texas Department of Family and Protective Services ("Dallas CPS"), Dawn Johnson, and Tennille Gavin's motion to dismiss6 . The Court grants the motion and dismisses all claims against Dallas CPS, Johnson, and Gavin. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/2/2016) (sss) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 03/21 11:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for Court's one week docket beginning 2/27/2017 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/21/2016) (sss) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/16 1:20 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF A SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER filed by Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Tennille Gavin, Dawn M. Johnson, Carrie Wright. (Laremont, Erika) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Thu 02/18 8:13 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2016) (bdb) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply
Tue 01/26 3:33 PM
REPLY filed by Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Tennille Gavin, Dawn M. Johnson re:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Laremont, Erika) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/15 3:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Application for Injunctive Relief WITH JURY DEMAND against Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Tennille Gavin, Dawn M. Johnson, Carrie Wright filed by Patricia Allen. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mem) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 01/15 12:49 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/15/2016) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File
Tue 01/12 4:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Patricia Allen with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Turley, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 01/12 4:29 PM
RESPONSE filed by Patricia Allen re:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Turley, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 12/28 11:50 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 1/12/2016 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/28/2015) (chmb) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 12/18 4:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Patricia Allen with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Turley, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 12/08 2:27 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Tennille Gavin, Dawn M. Johnson re7 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Laremont, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Appx pages 1 - 23, | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) Appx pages 24 - 51 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 12/08 2:25 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Tennille Gavin, Dawn M. Johnson re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Laremont, Erika) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 12/08 2:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Tennille Gavin, Dawn M. Johnson (Laremont, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned
Tue 11/24 2:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit; served on 11/17/2015. (bdb) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned
Mon 11/23 5:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tennille Gavin, served on 11/18/2015; Dawn M. Johnson, served on 11/18/2015. (axm) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
8
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/16 2:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Dallas County Child Protective Services Unit, Tennille Gavin, Dawn M. Johnson, Carrie Wright. (twd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/16/2015) (twd) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Godbey
Mon 11/16 2:26 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/16 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Patricia Allen. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-7191211) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Turley, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Interested Persons, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/16 2:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patricia Allen. (See1 for document.) (twd) |