Okeke v. Rodriguez et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew P Gordon |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02178 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 46:1156 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday May 14, 2016 3:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Thomas Cioppa
|
|
Defendant
Jeh Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Jeanne Kent
Las Vegas Field Office Director 5650 W. Badura Ave. #100
Las Vegas, NV 89118 |
|
Defendant
Loretta E Lynch
Attorney General of the United States 950 Pennsylvania Ave.
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Defendant
Leon Rodriguez
|
|
Petitioner
Matthew Obim Okeke
Agwara & Associates 4693 E. Flamingo Rd.
Las Vegas, NV 89121 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Thomas Cioppa
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jeh Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Jeanne Kent
Las Vegas Field Office Director 5650 W. Badura Ave. #100
Las Vegas, NV 89118 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Loretta E Lynch
Attorney General of the United States 950 Pennsylvania Ave.
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Leon Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/01 1:41 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE on ECF No.17 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 05/26 9:18 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Respondents Thomas Cioppa, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, Leon Rodriguez. (Peoples, T.) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Mon 05/02 3:40 PM
ORDER Granting15 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Answer Petition (Third Request). Respondents' answers are due 6/1/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation
Mon 05/02 8:47 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus ; by Respondents Thomas Cioppa, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, Leon Rodriguez. (Peoples, T.) |
|
Friday, March 25, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Fri 03/25 11:05 AM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Answer Petition (Second Request). The parties stipulate and agree that good cause exists to extend Respondents answer deadline by thirty days from 4/1/16, to 5/2/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Fri 03/25 7:00 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus ; by Respondents Thomas Cioppa, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, Leon Rodriguez. (Peoples, T.) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/21 2:16 PM
ORDER Granting Respondent's10 Motion to Admit Government Attorney T. Monique Peoples to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 02/10 11:03 AM
ORDER Granting9 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline to Answer Petition.. The parties stipulate and agree that good cause exists to correctRespondents' answer deadline from the deadline noted on8 to the correct answer date of 4/1/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/09 5:47 PM
MOTION to Admit Government Attorney to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment by Respondent Loretta E Lynch. Responses due by 2/26/2016. (Welsh, Blaine) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation
Tue 02/09 7:14 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus ; by Respondents Thomas Cioppa, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, Leon Rodriguez. (Peoples, T.) |
|
Monday, January 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 01/18 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Obim Okeke re7 Summons Issued. Thomas Cioppa served on 12/4/2015, answer due 2/2/2016; Jeh Johnson served on 12/4/2015, answer due 2/2/2016; Jeanne Kent served on 12/3/2015, answer due 2/1/2016; Loretta E Lynch served on 12/4/2015, answer due 2/2/2016; Leon Rodriguez served on 12/3/2015, answer due 2/1/2016.(Agwara, Liborius) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service (Defendant Kent), | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service (Defendant Lynch), | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service (Defendant Cioppa), | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service (Defendant Rodriguez) | ||
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/01 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Thomas Cioppa, Jeh Johnson, Jeanne Kent, Loretta E Lynch, and Leon Rodriguez re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (PS) |
|
6 | 6
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Tue 12/01 11:41 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Jeanne Kent , filed by Petitioner Matthew Obim Okeke. (Agwara, Liborius) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Tue 12/01 11:39 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Thomas Cioppa , filed by Petitioner Matthew Obim Okeke. (Agwara, Liborius) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Tue 12/01 11:38 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Loretta Lynch , filed by Petitioner Matthew Obim Okeke. (Agwara, Liborius) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Tue 12/01 11:37 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Leon Rodriguez , filed by Petitioner Matthew Obim Okeke. (Agwara, Liborius) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Tue 12/01 11:35 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Jeh Johnson , filed by Petitioner Matthew Obim Okeke. (Agwara, Liborius) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Mon 11/16 4:22 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-3893454), filed by Matthew Obim Okeke. (Agwara, Liborius) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 11/17 8:11 AM
Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (PS) |