Collins v. Schusterman et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Vicki Miles-Lagrange |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-01265 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday May 14, 2016 5:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
Yithak Amit
|
|
Defendant
International Fellowship of Christians and Jews
|
|
Defendant
Chaim Katz
|
|
Defendant
Tova Peri
|
|
Defendant
SOS Children's Village - USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lynn Schusterman
|
|
Defendant
Galit Mor Vigotski
|
|
Defendant
Women's International Zionist Organization
|
|
Plaintiff
Marygold Collins
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Order
Wed 07/27 1:17 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Order. The Court GRANTS plaintiffs Motion to Transfer docket no.16 and TRANSFERS this matter to the Northern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/27/16. (pw) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 07/27 4:27 PM
Docket Annotation: DETAILS: Case transferred from Oklahoma Westernhas been opened in U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Oklahomaas case 4:16-cv-00501, filed 07/27/2016. (pw) |
||
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Order
Wed 07/06 8:28 AM
MOTION for Order by Marygold Collins.(pw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Translation form Hebrew of Criminal Indictment, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Indictment in Hebrew, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 06/23 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER directing plaintiff to file a substantive brief addressing the issue of whether this Court is the proper venue to hear this matter, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b). Plaintiff shall file said brief on or before July 25, 2016. If plaintiff fails to file her brief, this matter will be subject to dismissal, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/23/2016. (ks) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Wed 03/09 11:25 AM
LETTER from Marigold Collins (pw) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/05 12:14 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Yithak Amit, International Fellowship of Christians and Jews, Chaim Katz, Tova Peri, SOS Children's Village - USA Inc, Lynn Schusterman, Galit Mor Vigotski, Women's International Zionist Organization. (kr) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Thu 12/31 9:43 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to SOS Children's Village - USA Inc.(cps) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/31 9:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marygold Collins. Chaim Katz served on 12/21/2015.(cps) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/31 9:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marygold Collins. International Fellowship of Christians and Jews served on 12/21/2015. (cps) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/31 9:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marygold Collins. Women's International Zionist Organization served on 12/21/2015.(cps) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/31 9:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marygold Collins. Lynn Schusterman served on 12/15/2015.(cps) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/31 9:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marygold Collins. Galit Mor Vigotski served on 12/21/2015.(cps) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Proof of Service of Isreal court Administrator, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/31 9:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marygold Collins. Yithak Amit served on 12/21/2015.(cps) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Proof of Service of Isreal court Administrator, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/31 9:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marygold Collins. Tova Peri served on 12/21/2015.(cps) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Proof of Service wo Isreal court Administrator, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 11/18 10:20 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/18/2015. (brs) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 11/17 10:05 AM
PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 8 SUMMONS(ES) by Marygold Collins. (cps) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/17 9:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marygold Collins. (cps) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/17 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marygold Collins.(cps) (cps) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 (11/17/2015) Envelope |