6
|
|
6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 11/23 11:13 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edmond Nicholas.. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/17 2:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Pfizer, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 11/17 2:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2016. Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 11/17 1:59 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 12/1/2015. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/17 12:06 PM
Proposed Summons. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/17 12:04 PM
COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Inc Pfizer (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0971-9998717). Filed by Edmond Nicholas.(Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 11/17/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|