District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:15-cv-02037
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause38:4301 Uniformed Services Employment & Re-Employment Rights
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2015
Terminated:Dec 19, 2016
Last checked: Saturday May 21, 2016 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
TREY GOWDY
Represented By
Kimberly Ann Hamm
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Kerry William Kircher
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Isaac Benjamin Rosenberg
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Sarah Knutson Curran
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Defendant
U.S. House of Representatives Select Committee on the Events Surrounding the 2012 Terrorist Attack in Benghazi of the
Defendant
U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES SELECT COMMITTEE ON THE EVENTS SURROUNDING THE 2012 TERRORIST ATTACK IN BENGHAZI
Represented By
Gloria Lett
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Mark Stewart Hayes
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Russell Hayes Gore
U.S. House Of Representatives
contact info
Plaintiff
Bradley F. Podliska
Represented By
Peter Romer-Friedman
Washington Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights
contact info
Plaintiff
BRADLEY F. PODLISKA
Represented By
Kathryn S. Piscitelli
Kathryn S. Piscitelli, Attorney Of Law
contact info
Conrad Risher
Office Of The Attorney General For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Conrad Z. Risher
Washington Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights
contact info
Peter Romer-Friedman
Washington Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights
contact info
Thomas G. Jarrard
Law Office Of Thomas G. Jarrard, PLLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, December 19, 2016
54 54 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal by BRADLEY F. PODLISKA. (Romer-Friedman, Peter)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal54 , this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/19/2016. (lcrdm3, )
Related: [-]