Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-30063

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:15-ap-02438
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2015
Terminated:Apr 08, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Edward J. Campbell, Sr.
2 Carnegie Place
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920
Represented By
Edward J. Campbell, Sr.
contact info
Plaintiff
John M. McDonnell
McDonnell Crowley, LLC 115 Maple Avenue Suite 201
Red Bank, NJ 07701
Represented By
Brian Thomas Crowley
Mcdonnell Crowley, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago
Sunday, April 10, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 04/11 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
6 6 order To Close Case Fri 04/08 10:41 AM
ORDER CLOSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING (Case Number: 3:2015-ap-2438-CMG). Reason: Dismissed or settled without entry of judgment. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/8/2016. (bwj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John M. McDonnell
utility Close Adversary Case Fri 04/08 4:26 PM
Adversary Case (3:15-ap-2438) Closed. (slf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
utility Terminate Deadline Wed 04/06 9:39 AM
objection to notice of information Deadline Terminated, Reason: no objections filed (gan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2016
court Hearing Held Thu 03/17 8:04 AM
Minute of 3/16/16, OUTCOME: SETTLED Related [+] (bwj )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, March 10, 2016
5 5 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Thu 03/10 9:21 AM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Settlement between the Chapter 7 Trustee, the Debtor and the non-debtor spouse. Hearing scheduled for 4/12/16 @ 10am. Filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of John M. McDonnell. Objections due by 4/5/2016. (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/14 5:09 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by David M. Taus on behalf of Edward J. Campbell Sr.. (Taus, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2015
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/30 4:20 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brian Thomas Crowley on behalf of John M. McDonnell. (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-02438 Complaint by John M. McDonnell against Edward J. Campbell Sr.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) filed by Plaintiff John M. McDonnell,2 Summons Issued to John M. McDonnell for Service on Edward J. Campbell Sr. Answer due on 12/30/2015 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/16/2016 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions Joint Scheduling Order & Joint Mediation Order) (gan)
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/30 11:26 AM
Summons Issued to John M. McDonnell for Service on Edward J. Campbell Sr. Answer due on 12/30/2015 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/16/2016 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (gan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions Joint Scheduling Order & Joint Mediation Order
court Receipt - Generic - BK - Court Use Only Tue 12/01 9:35 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee Amount $ 350.00, Receipt Number 616563. Fee received from John McDonnell (mrg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/24 4:33 PM
Adversary case 15-02438 Complaint by John M. McDonnell against Edward J. Campbell Sr.. Receipt Number Est Acct, Fee Amount $ 350.. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Crowley, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A