Linden Care, LLC v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Original Case: 1:15-cv-01335
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-03820 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 19, 2016 5:21 PM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Express Scripts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Linden Care, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/19/2016 3:00 PM EST |
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Linden Care, LLC, FILED. [1652458] 15-3820 [Entered: 11/30/2015 11:51 AM] | |
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1652465] 15-3820 [Entered: 11/30/2015 11:53 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Linden Care, LLC, district court receipt # 02063498496, FILED.[1652513] 15-3820 [Entered: 11/30/2015 12:12 PM] |