Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:13-bk-18727

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:George B Nielsen Jr
Case #: 2:15-ap-00940
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2015
Terminated:May 10, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gloria Gifford
Represented By
Gloria Gifford
contact info
Plaintiff
Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC
80 E Columbus Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85012
Represented By
MICHAEL W. CARMEL
Michael W. Carmel, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:05 PM MST
Thursday, July 21, 2016
24 24 vCal Virtual Minute Entry Thu 07/21 12:48 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 07/21/2016 Subject: ORAL ARGUMENT ON GABRIEL HYAMS'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON GLORIA GIFFORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON PINNACLE TRANSPLANT TECHNOLOGIES' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON RUTH STROMER'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON AMNIO TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON HALYARD HOLDINGS LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P (12)(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON 6434 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6). Appearances: Proceedings: VACATED: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY ENTERED 5/9/16. ADVERSARY DISMISSED.. (vCal Hearing ID (1335298)). Related [+] (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, May 10, 2016
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/12 10:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order Dismissing Adversary
22 22 order oDismissing Adversary Tue 05/10 7:41 AM
ORDER Granting Stipulation For Dismissal Of Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice signed on 5/10/2016 Related [+] . (Brenner, Christel)
Related: [-] 20 ,21 Stipulation for Dismissal of Complaint
court Close Adversary Tue 05/10 7:41 AM
Adversary Terminated . (Brenner, Christel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
21 21 other Stipulation for Dismissal of Complaint Mon 05/09 2:22 PM
Stipulation for Dismissal of Complaint Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice and Notice of Lodging Order filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC. Related [+](CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, April 14, 2016
20 20 vCal Virtual Minute Entry Thu 04/14 9:14 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 04/20/2016 Subject: ORAL ARGUMENT ON GABRIEL HYAMS'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON GLORIA GIFFORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON PINNACLE TRANSPLANT TECHNOLOGIES' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON RUTH STROMER'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON AMNIO TECHNOLOGY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON HALYARD HOLDINGS LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P (12)(b)(6) AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON 6434 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6). Appearances: NONE. Proceedings: VACATED: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE ENTERED 4/13/16. CONTINUED TO 7/21/16 AT 9:30 AM.. (vCal Hearing ID (1331388)). Related [+] Oral Argument set for 07/21/2016 at 09:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ) (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
19 19 order oApproving Wed 04/13 3:00 PM
ORDER Approving Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaints signed on 4/13/2016 Related [+] Oral Argument Continued To 7/21/2016 at 09:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ) . (Brenner, Christel)
Related: [-] 5 ,11 ,18 Stipulation
18 18 other Stipulation Wed 04/13 1:35 PM
Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Complaints and Notice of Lodging Order filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC. Related [+](CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 11 Order
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 17, 2016
17 17 audio Tue 03/22 7:42 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 03/17/2016 09:30 AM ]. File Size [ 10,361 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:22:06 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1328720)).(Orosco, Leticia)
Related: [-]
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/20 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order
15 15 vCal Minute Entry Thu 03/17 2:21 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/17/2016 Subject: HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (vCal Hearing ID (1328720)). Related [+] (Lowry, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 6
14 14 order oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC Thu 03/17 12:26 PM
ORDER signed on 3/17/2016 Related [+] Oral Argument set for 4/20/2016 at 09:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ) . (Brenner, Christel)
Related: [-] 5 ,6 Motion to Amend
Monday, March 14, 2016
13 13 answer Reply Mon 03/14 11:30 AM
Reply to Motion/Application Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Objection to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)6
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/04 11:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order
11 11 order oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC Wed 03/02 12:02 PM
ORDER Setting Oral Argument On Defendants' Motions To Dismiss Complaint With Prejudice Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) signed on 3/2/2016 Related [+] Oral Argument Set For 4/20/2016 at 09:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ) . (Brenner, Christel)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Monday, February 29, 2016
10 10 answer Objection Mon 02/29 4:12 PM
Objection to Motion/Application DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Related [+] filed by BRAD TERRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of Gloria Gifford. (TERRY, BRAD)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)6
Friday, February 19, 2016
9 9 answer Reply Fri 02/19 3:15 PM
Reply to Motion/Application DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) Related [+] filed by BRAD TERRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of Gloria Gifford. (TERRY, BRAD)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)5
Thursday, February 04, 2016
8 8 notice Hearing (Notice of) Thu 02/04 1:28 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC Related [+] Hearing set for 3/17/2016 at 09:30 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 602, Phoenix, AZ (GBN/VJ) Objections/Responses due by 2/29/2016,. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Amend
Monday, February 01, 2016
7 7 answer Response Mon 02/01 3:17 PM
Response to Motion/Application Response to Motion to Dismiss Related [+] filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] lated to motions(s)5
6 6 motion Amend (Motion to) Mon 02/01 2:45 PM
Motion to Amend Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC Related [+]. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, January 04, 2016
5 5 motion Dismiss Complaint (Motion to) Mon 01/04 3:56 PM
Motion to Dismiss Complaint DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by SUSAN G BOSWELL of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of Gloria Gifford Related [+]. (BOSWELL, SUSAN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, December 04, 2015
4 4 notice Certificate of Service Fri 12/04 10:24 AM
Certificate of Service filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC Related [+]. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, 2 Request for Issuance of Summons
3 3 court Summons Issued (Form) Fri 12/04 9:02 AM
Summons Issued . (Brenner, Christel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2015
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/03 4:13 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Does not include a Section 727 Objection to Discharge) (350.00 fee) Thu 12/03 4:12 PM
Complaint (Fee Due) against Gloria Gifford filed by MICHAEL W. CARMEL of MICHAEL W. CARMEL, LTD. on behalf of Reorganized Stromer/Southwest Medical & Orthopedics, LLC. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
court Adversary Proceeding Opened Thu 12/03 4:10 PM
Adversary case 2:15-ap-00940. Adversary Proceeding Opened. (CARMEL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Thu 12/03 4:12 PM
Receipt of Complaint(2:15-ap-00940-GBN) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26276714. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]