Arizona District Court
Judge:Jacqueline M Rateau
Case #: 4:15-cv-00565
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 03, 2015
Terminated:Jun 09, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday May 31, 2016 1:51 AM MST
Defendant
Bank of America NA
Represented By
Robert W Shely
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Daniel Price Crane
Bryan Cave Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Shayna Fernandez Watts
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Y Hu
PO Box 66093
Tucson, AZ 85728


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, June 09, 2016
48 48 order Clerks Judgment Thu 06/09 4:51 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, per the Court's order entered on 6/9/16, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice and this case is closed.(BAC)
Related: [-]
47 47 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 06/09 4:30 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that BANA's11 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following motions are denied as moot:17 Motion for Summary Judgment;30 Motion to Grant Plaintiffs Summary Judgment;32 Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case;40 Motion to Seek Relief and Punitive Damages against Defendant for Multiple Violation of Court Orders;41 Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case;42 Motion to Withdraw; and43 Motion to Seek for Relief and Punitive Damages against Defendant for Multiple Counts of Misconducts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is a vexatious litigant, and the Clerk of the Court shall designate Plaintiff as such for the purpose of tracking any future filings by him in this Court. If Plaintiff wishes to file an action in this Court, he shall lodge a motion for leave to file captioned as an "Application Pursuant to Court Order Seeking Leave to File" in accordance with the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual for the District of Arizona. The procedures set forth in this Order shall apply to cases filed by Plaintiff in other courts that are removed to this Court. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 6/8/16.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
46 46 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/03 2:50 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:40 MOTION * to Seek Relief and Punitive Damages filed by Bank of America NA. (Crane, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2016
45 45 misc 25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge Tue 05/31 8:16 AM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Rateau conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (FKD)
Related: [-]
44 44 misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 05/31 8:10 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (FKD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
43 43 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/26 7:50 AM
MOTION to seek for Relief and Punitive Damages against the Defendant for Multiple Counts of Misconducts by Paul Y Hu. (KEP)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
42 42 motion Withdraw Mon 05/23 2:45 PM
MOTION to Withdraw41 MOTION to Strike11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Paul Y Hu. (KEP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2016
41 41 motion Strike Fri 05/20 12:00 PM
MOTION to Strike Defendant's11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Paul Y Hu. (3 pages). (BAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/17 11:27 AM
NOTICE re: Disassociation of Counsel by Bank of America NA . (Crane, Daniel)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Tue 05/17 8:20 AM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline.(FKD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 consent form
Monday, May 16, 2016
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/17 4:46 PM
MOTION to Seek Relief and Punitive Damages against the Defendant for Multiple Violation of Court Orders by Paul Y Hu. (1 page). (BAC)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/16 3:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:32 MOTION to Strike11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Bank of America NA. (Crane, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/16 4:15 PM
NOTICE by Paul Y Hu. (2 pages). (BAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2016
36 36 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 05/16 4:13 PM
Miscellaneous Document from Pau Y. Hu. (4 pages). (BAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/09 2:48 PM
NOTICE re: Total Disconnect- Defendant by Paul Y Hu. (2 pages). (BAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2016
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/06 3:14 PM
NOTICE of the rolls each of the Defandant Attorneys perform by Paul Y Hu. (DLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
32 32 motion Strike Wed 05/04 4:11 PM
MOTION to Strike11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Case by Paul Y Hu. (KEP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/03 3:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:30 MOTION No Answers for ONe Month Beyond the Court specified date filed by Bank of America NA. (Crane, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2016
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/03 12:15 PM
MOTION to Grant Plaintiff's Summary Judgment / No Answers for One Month Beyond the Court specified date by Paul Y Hu. (KEP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2016
29 29 misc Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing Mon 04/04 12:44 PM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Paul Y Hu. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (KEP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
27 27 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 03/01 4:37 PM
Miscellaneous Document from Plaintiff, Pau Y. Hu.(BAC)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 03/01 3:10 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the23 Motion to Strike17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bank of America NA is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and that, if necessary, defendant shall have 30 days from the filing date of the Court's order on defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss to file its response to the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 2/29/16.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
28 28 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/01 4:40 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:23 MOTION to Strike17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Y Hu.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2016
25 25 misc Miscellaneous Document Fri 02/26 1:20 PM
Miscellaneous Document: The Choices of Ignoring/Complying/Exciting/Arguing/Appealing the Federal and Superior Court Orders from Paul Y. Hu. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2016
24 24 misc Response Mon 02/22 3:05 PM
RESPONSE re:22 Reply to Response to11 Motion to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Paul Y Hu. (4 pages) (KAH)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Strike Mon 02/22 2:36 PM
MOTION to Strike17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bank of America NA.(Crane, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike
Monday, February 15, 2016
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 02/15 7:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Bank of America NA. (Watts, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/02 4:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re:11 MOTION to Dismiss Case . IT IS ORDERED that BANA shall have an extension of time through and including 2/15/16 to file a Reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 2/2/16.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/01 4:31 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Bank of America NA.(Watts, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 29, 2016
19 19 misc Supplement Mon 02/01 2:36 PM
Answer to Motion by Plaintiff Paul Y Hu. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
18 18 respm Response to Motion Mon 01/25 1:22 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Paul Y Hu. (MFR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/22 10:58 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff, Paul Y Hu. (BAC)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/22 10:57 AM
NOTICE re: 2015 Lawsuit Claims by Plaintiff, Paul Y Hu.(BAC)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/22 10:56 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff, Paul Y Hu. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
17 17 motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/22 11:07 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul Y Hu.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
16 16 respm Response to Motion Fri 01/22 11:05 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Paul Y Hu.(BAC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Supplement,
Att: 4 Supplement,
Att: 5 Supplement
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
12 12 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Tue 01/12 4:39 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a response to Defendant's11 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file any reply within 15 days from the date Plaintiff's response is filed. The Motion shall be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 1/12/16. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2016
11 11 motion Dismiss Case Mon 01/11 4:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Bank of America NA.(Watts, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, December 29, 2015
10 10 misc 25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 12/29 8:37 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (FKD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
9 9 misc 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline Wed 12/23 12:23 PM
Magistrate Election Form Deadline.(FKD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 consent form
Friday, December 18, 2015
8 8 order Order Fri 12/18 11:50 AM
ORDER Plaintiff Paul Y. Hu's Application for Entry of Default (Doc.6 ) is DENIED as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 12/18/2015. (DLC)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Response Fri 12/18 9:46 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Defendant Bank of America NA. (Watts, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
6 6 misc Application for Entry of Default Thu 12/17 3:52 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Paul Y Hu against Bank of America NA. (3 pages) (KAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2015
5 5 order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/14 12:58 PM
ORDER granting4 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Bank of America NA answer due 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 12/11/15. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2015
4 4 misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Thu 12/10 3:57 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT .(Watts, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 03, 2015
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 12/04 11:34 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12396648. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:15-CV-00565-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached..(FKD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 consent form
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/04 11:19 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America NA. (Watts, Shayna) (FKD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 12/04 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20155003. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12396648 filed by Bank of America NA. (Watts, Shayna)(FKD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Declaration of Counsel
service Service Executed Fri 12/04 11:31 AM
*** State Court Record Received***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Paul Y Hu: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, and Forcible Detention of my Retirement Home-Property Location Address; Lot 65 Miranmonte at the River, 304 Cedarvale Rd., Tucson Arizona upon Bank of America National Association on 11/5/2015 (original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 11/12/15). (FKD)
Related: [-]