Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc. et al v. HSBC Bank plc et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-01412 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
HSBC Bank plc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HSBC France
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.
745 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Commercial Corporation
745 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
745 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 09/19 12:54 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1412 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/16 5:19 PM
Stipulation of dismissal of adversary proceeding Filed by Diane Lee Cafferata on behalf of Lehman Brothers Commercial Corporation, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Cafferata, Diane) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Thu 06/09 3:01 PM
So Ordered Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order signed on 6/9/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/13 11:00 AM
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Diane L. Cafferata signed on 5/13/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Thu 05/12 9:53 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Diane C. Hutnyan on behalf of Lehman Brothers Commercial Corporation, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Hutnyan, Diane) |
|
Att: 1 State of California Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 05/12 9:56 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 15-01412 scc) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11278429. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion, Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 05/06 11:52 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Joseph W. Dunn on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Dunn, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/06 11:06 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Demetri Blaisdell on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Blaisdell, Demetri) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/29 4:20 PM
Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan signed on 1/29/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 01/20 4:39 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel P Cunningham on behalf of Lehman Brothers Commercial Corporation, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Cunningham, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/19 4:36 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Jonathan Chi-Shoong Cho on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Chi-Shoong Cho, Jonathan) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/19 4:34 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Laura R Hall on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Hall, Laura) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/19 4:33 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Kenneth P. Coleman on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Coleman, Kenneth) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/19 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Daniel J. Guyder on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Guyder, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/19 1:57 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph W. Dunn on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Dunn, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/19 1:53 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by John F. LaSalle on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (LaSalle, John) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/19 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Jack G. Stern on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Stern, Jack) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Statement
Thu 01/14 11:37 AM
Statement Corporate Ownership filed by Damien J. Marshall on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Marshall, Damien) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
answer
None
Thu 01/07 2:35 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Damien J. Marshall on behalf of HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited. (Marshall, Damien) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/11 5:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Ellison Ward on behalf of Lehman Brothers Commercial Corporation, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Ward, Ellison) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 12/08 3:24 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/21/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), Answer due by 1/7/2016, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 12/04 6:30 PM
Adversary case 15-01412 Complaint against HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Bank USA, National Association, HSBC France, The Hongkong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited and Objection to Claim Nos. 10933, 10935, 18864, 18867, 18868, 18869, 43789, 43790, 45092 and 45094 . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Andrew J. Rossman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc., Lehman Brothers Commercial Corporation, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rossman, Andrew) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 12/04 6:33 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-01412 scc) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11036471. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |