Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Case #: 1:15-cv-10989
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2015
Terminated:Jan 13, 2016
Last checked: Monday Jun 06, 2016 4:23 AM CDT
Defendant
National Hockey League
Defendant
National Hockey League Board of Governors
Plaintiff
Paul Montador
Represented By
Thomas A. Demetrio
Corboy & Demetrio
contact info
Richard R Gordon
Gordon Law Offices, Ltd.
contact info
William T Gibbs
Corboy & Demetrio
contact info


1. Family of former Blackhawks defenseman Steve Montador sues NHL (chicagotribune.com)
Submitted Wed 12/09/2015
Docket last updated: 06/07/2018 10:43 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 08, 2015
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Daniel Martin. (ags, )
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Paul Montador; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11374133.(Gibbs, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Montador by Richard R Gordon (Gordon, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Montador by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Paul Montador by Thomas A. Demetrio (Demetrio, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Samuel Der-Yeghiayan: Initial status hearing set for 02/09/16 at 9:00 a.m. At least four working days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall conduct a FRCP 26(f) conference and file a joint written Initial Status Report, not to exceed five pages in length, and file the Court's Joint Jurisdictional Status Report and deliver courtesy copies to this Court's Courtroom Deputy in Room 1908. The Court's standing orders on the Initial Status Report and Joint Jurisdictional Status Report maybe obtained from Judge Der-Yeghiayan's web page or from this Court's Courtroom Deputy. Counsel for the Plaintiff is warned that failure to serve summons and complaint on Defendants will result in a dismissal of the action and/or a dismissal of that Defendant not properly served pursuant to FRCP 4. Counsel for Plaintiff is further directed to file with the Clerk of Court, the appropriate returns of service and/or waivers of service. Mailed notice (mw, )
Related: [-]