Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01458
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2015
Terminated:Aug 05, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Young Kim
Represented By
Young Kim
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, January 11, 2018
33 33 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 01/18 1:25 PM
Hearing Held: Related [+] RULING: O/C - WITHDRAWN BY TRUSTEE'S COUNSEL.
Related: [-] Related Doc #28 Examination of Yong Kim aka Amy Kim RE: Enforcement of Judgmentid, Rick
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
32 32 misc Proof of service Tue 01/09 9:00 AM
Proof of service Service of the JDE Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
31 31 misc Proof of service Mon 01/08 4:33 PM
Proof of service Service of the JDE Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR). (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/28 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/28/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion for Examination (BNC-PDF)
Friday, December 22, 2017
29 29 court Hearing Set (Motion) Fri 12/22 5:21 PM
Hearing Set Related [+]. The Examination of Yong Kim aka Amy Kim RE: Enforcement of Judgment is set for 1/11/2018 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 28
28 28 order Examination (BNC-PDF) Fri 12/22 4:27 PM
Order to Appear for Examination (Yong Kim aka Amy Kim) [1-11-18 at 9:30am in Courtroom 5A] (PDF-BNC) Related [+] Signed on 12/22/2017.
Related: [-] 27 id, Rick
27 27 motion Examination (motion) Fri 12/22 4:25 PM
Application for Order to Appear for Examination (Yong Kim aka Amy Kim) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Rick
Friday, August 05, 2016
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/05 4:12 PM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1458 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack,18 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, June 30, 2016
25 25 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 07/01 5:05 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] RULING: OFF CALENDAR: Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Yong Kim aka Amy Kim Entered 6/10/16; Judgment Entered 6/10/16.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Thursday, June 16, 2016
24 24 misc Status report Thu 06/16 11:13 AM
Status report Unilateral Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 21 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Sunday, June 12, 2016
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 06/12 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/12/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 06/12 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/12/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Friday, June 10, 2016
20 20 order JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Fri 06/10 3:23 PM
JUDGMENT is ENTERED in favor of the Plaintiff and against defendant, Yong Kim aka Amy Kim (Defendant) in the amount of $33,835.76 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/10/2016. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Rick
19 19 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Fri 06/10 3:16 PM
Order Granting Motion For Entry of Default Judgment Against Yong Kim AKA Amy Kim (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/10/2016.
Related: [-] 14 id, Rick
Thursday, June 09, 2016
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 06/10 7:48 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 on Court's Own Motion. Subsequently, Status Conference Set for 6/30/2016 at 9:30 a.m. is OFF CALENDAR; Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Yong Kim aka Amy Kim Entered 6/10/2016; Judgment Entered 6/10/2016 The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Monday, June 06, 2016
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/06 3:59 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
17 17 misc Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Fri 06/03 5:49 PM
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) ; Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Richard A. Marshack in Support; with Proof of Service [Hrg. 5/12/16 at 9:30 a.m., Ctrm. 5A]
Att: 1 Part 2
Friday, May 06, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of motion/application Fri 05/06 12:33 PM
Notice of motion/application Amended Notice of Motion for Default Judgment - to Correct Hearing Date; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Richard A. Marshack in Support; with Proof of Service [Hrg. 5/12/16 at 9:30 a.m., Ctrm. 5A] Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Default Judgment Motion due by 05/23/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 # 2 Part 3) (Wood, David) Warning: Item subsequently amended by docket entry no: 15. Modified on 4/22/2016. filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, April 22, 2016
15 15 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 04/22 11:19 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date/time was selected. The hearing on this matter will be set for June 30, 2016 at 9:30am in Courtroom 5A. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING WITH CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. Related [+]
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Thursday, April 21, 2016
14 14 motion Default Judgment (motion) Thu 04/21 3:47 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Richard A. Marshack in Support; with Proof of Service [Hrg. 5/12/16 at 9:30 a.m., Ctrm. 5A] Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Default Judgment Motion due by 05/23/2016. (Wood, David) Warning: Item subsequently amended by docket entry no: 15. Modified on 4/22/2016 Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Rick
Att: 1 Part 2
Att: 2 Part 3
Thursday, March 10, 2016
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 1:02 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. A motion for default judgment may self-calendared for the same date/time as the continued Status Conference date. Alternatively, the motion may be filed without a hearing pursuant to the procedure set forth in Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1(o). The motion for default judgment, supported by evidence, must be served on defendant and defendant's counsel in accordance with Local Rule 9013-1(d). If the motion for default judgment is not heard by the continued date of the Status Conference, THE ADVERSARY MAY BE DISMISSED at the Status Conference for failure to prosecute. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, March 03, 2016
12 12 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 1:00 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, on Court's Own Motion. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, February 19, 2016
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/19 5:05 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
10 10 misc Status report Thu 02/18 11:50 AM
Status report Unilateral Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, February 11, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 02/11 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/11/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
8 8 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Tue 02/09 4:21 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Young Kim aka Amy Kim Related [+] (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 6 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, February 05, 2016
7 7 misc Declaration Fri 02/05 12:50 PM
Declaration re: in Support of Request for Entry of Default re Defendant Young Kim aka Amy Kim; with Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-] 6 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Fri 02/05 12:47 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Young Kim aka Amy Kim Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
5 5 notice Notice Thu 12/17 5:06 PM
Notice to Defendant Re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/17 5:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on Young Kim 12/17/2015 (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 12/17 5:02 PM
Summons Service Executed on Young Kim 12/17/2015 (Marshack, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 12/10 3:29 PM
Summons Issued on Young Kim Date Issued 12/10/2015, Answer Due 1/11/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Wednesday, December 09, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/09 4:50 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01458. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against Young Kim. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Preferential, Fraudulent, and Unauthorized Post-Petition Transfers Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet