IN RE: PACKAGED SEAFOOD PRODUCTS ANTITRUST LITIGATION
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dana M Sabraw |
Referred: | Michael S Berg |
Case #: | 3:15-md-02670 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:0001 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade) |
Case Filed: | Dec 09, 2015 |
Case in other court: | USCA, 19-56514 USCA, 19-80108 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 1:23 PM PST |
Consol Plaintiff
Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bumble Bee Foods LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Del Monte Foods Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dongwon Enterprises
|
|
Defendant
King Oscar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Starkist Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thai Union Frozen Products PCL
|
|
Defendant
Thai Union Group Public Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thai Union North America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tri Marine International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tri-Union Seafoods LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
United States Department of Justice
Antitrust Division 450 Golden Gate Avenue Box 36046, Room 10-0101
San Francisco,, CA 94102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A-1 Diner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louise Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Affiliated Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janelle Albarello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albertsons Companies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nay Alidad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Galyna Andrusyshyn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Associated Food Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Associated Grocers of New England, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Associated Grocers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Benjamin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Foods LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Berger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bi-Lo Holding, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Blumstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Blumstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Bowman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Breitbach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brookshire Brothers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brookshire Grocery Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adam Buehrens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Buenning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Buff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Burr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Caldwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jade Canterbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Capitol Hill Supermarket
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Kearney, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Central Grocers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Certco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Childs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Casey Christensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Coffey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven M. Colberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jody Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sally Crnkovich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra L. Damske
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sunde Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louise Ann Davis Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Davis-Berg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Decker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Demonaco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Dennis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Depperschmidt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vivek Dravid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Dunlap
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dutch Village Restaurant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FAREWAY STORES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karren Fabian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Fragoso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Giant Eagle, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Gipson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Durand Gore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tina Grant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Greenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
H.E. Butt Grocery Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheryl Haley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harvesters Enterprises, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tya Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hy-Vee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blair Hysni
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marissa Jacobus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Gross & Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy Joseph
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Juetten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwayne Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sterling King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert H. Kliegerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabrielle Kurdt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph A. Langston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lesgo Personal Chef LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Lesher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Levy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carla Lown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Lybarger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Machin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
McLane Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katherine McMahon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meijer Distribution, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meijer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Mey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Millican
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beth Milliner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liza Milliner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jinkyoung Moon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colin Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Musgrave
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer A. Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Norris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central Distributors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evelyn Olive
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara E. Olson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pacific Groservice Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Peychal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Pinto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Potvin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Pruess
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virginia Rakipi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robby Reed
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Rizzo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramon Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SIMON-HINDI, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seth Salenger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam's East, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam's West, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joelyna A. San Agustin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Metivier Schadt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Seidenburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Lee Simoens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarissa Simon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Stafford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Stearns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Stiller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Kroger Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Todd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Ton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Truyen Ton-Vuong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Trent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Twitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
URM Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Unified Grocers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Vanderlaan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Vangemert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
W Lee Flowers & Co Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WOODMAN'S FOOD MARKET, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wakefern Food Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Walnum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nigel Warren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amy E Waterman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Western Family Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas E. Willoughby III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edy Yee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Yelvington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Youngblood
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Dongwon Enterprises Co. Ltd.
Terminated: 10/31/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd
Terminated: 10/31/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd.
Terminated: 10/31/2016
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Powers
Terminated: 05/16/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 4:00 AM PDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
3385 | 3385
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3367 Order, Set Hearings. Mail sent to Jalaine Garcia. (bdc) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
3383 | 3383
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3355 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail sent to Nancy A. Kulesa. (bdc) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
3384 | 3384
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3367 Order, Set Hearings. Mail sent to Alyson Louise Oliver. (bdc) |
|
3382 | 3382
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3367 Order, Set Hearings. Mail sent to Richard J. Kilsheimer. (bdc) |
|
3381 | 3381
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3363 Order. Mail sent to Richard J. Kilsheimer. (bdc) |
|
3380 | 3380
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3355 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail sent to Richard J. Kilsheimer. (bdc) |
|
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
3379 | 3379
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3367 Order, Set Hearings. Mail sent to Gary McKay Yarborough, Jr. (bdc) |