Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Case #: 5:15-mc-01106
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseMotion to Quash
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 9:42 AM CST
Defendant
Mario Garcia
26931 Millstone Cove
Boerne, TX 78015
Represented By
Charles J. Muller, III
Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams & Martin, PC
contact info
Defendant
The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Clint Alexander Corrie
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nick Vertucci
Represented By
Clint Alexander Corrie
Akerman LLP
contact info
Movant
Education Management Services, LLC
Represented By
Nathaniel C. Corbett
contact info
Andrew J. Moon
contact info
Movant
Real Estate Training International, LLC
Represented By
Nathaniel C. Corbett
contact info
Andrew J. Moon
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, January 12, 2016
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 01/12 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles J. Muller, III on behalf of Mario Garcia. Attorney Charles J. Muller, III added to party Mario Garcia(pty:dft) (Muller, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
5 5 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 01/05 4:23 PM
ORDER DENYING4 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2016
4 4 motion Reconsideration Mon 01/04 11:34 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration by Real Estate Training International, LLC.(Moon, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nathaniel Corbett in support of Motion for Reconsideration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 22, 2015
3 3 order Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion to Compel Tue 12/22 4:17 PM
ORDER DENYING1 Motion to Quash; GRANTING2 Motion to Compel; Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
2 2 motion Compel Fri 12/18 5:19 PM
MOTION to Compel (Mario Garcia's Compliance with Subpoenas and Opposition to Motion to Quash or Alternatively Issue a Protective Order) by The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc., Nick Vertucci.(Corrie, Clint)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Pt. 1 of 2),
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Pt 2 of 2),
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting The Nick Vertucci Companies, Inc. and Nick Vertucci's Motion to Compel Mario Garcia's Compliance with Subpoenas
Friday, December 11, 2015
1 1 motion Quash Fri 12/11 3:49 PM
EXPEDITED MOTION to Quash or Alternatively Issue a Protective Order by Education Management Services, LLC, Real Estate Training International, LLC.(dtg) (dtg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Armando Montelongo, Jr.,
Att: 2 Declaration of Nathaniel Corbett,
Att: 3 Exhibits A -thru- Exhibits I to Expedited Motion to Quash,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Att: 5 (12/11/2015) Filing Fee Receipt