Samuel Barahona v. Animal Behavior College, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Manuel L Real |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-09584 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Dec 11, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2016 2:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
ANIMAL BEHAVIOR COLLEGE, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Animal Behavior College, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Barahona
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Debbie Kendrick
Terminated: 03/28/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
Certify Attorney Fees
Wed 11/02 4:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES by Judge Manuel L. Real: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement26 and Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs27 is GRANTED. Class counsel asks this Court to approve the attorney fees agreed upon in the proposed settlement. Class counsel has agreed to a fee of $25,000. Based on the records and documentation provided by class counsel as well as the result achieved, the attorney fees and costs are reasonable. See document for further details. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Tue 10/04 4:50 PM
DECLARATION of Kelsey Skey Supplemental Declaration in support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Final Approval of Settlement Class26 filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
31 | 31
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 10/04 4:41 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Plaintiff Samuel Barahona's Motion to Certify Final Approval of Settlement Class26 and Motion for Attorney Fees27 set for hearing on October 17, 2016 at 10:00 A.M., are suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties, without the need for oral argument; therefore, the said Motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed, and the hearing date of October 17, 2016 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iv) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Tue 10/04 3:08 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Approval of Settlement Class and Motion for Attorney's Fees29 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to the Motion, document number26 , or a Notice of Lodging, Local Rule 5-4.4.1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (clee) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Supplement (Motion related)
Mon 09/19 8:38 PM
SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Final Approval of Settlement Class26 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 27 [Proposed] Order in support filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Mon 09/19 8:35 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Tracy in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Final Approval of Settlement Class26 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees 27 filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona.(Tracy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
27 | 27
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 09/19 8:34 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Certify
Mon 09/19 8:32 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Final Approval of Settlement Class filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Samuel Barahona, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Kelsey Skey | ||
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 07/12 12:59 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT NEED OF ORAL ARGUMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court has determined that Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class21 set for hearing on July 18, 2016 at 10:00 A.M., is suitable for a decision on the papers as filed by all parties, without the need for oral argument; therefore, the said Motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION on the papers as filed, and the hearing date of July 18, 2016 is VACATED and TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. The Court will issue its ruling on the matter in due course. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Certify Class Action
Tue 07/12 4:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT CLASS by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Class21 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The proposed Settlement of this action is preliminarily approved and is hereby preliminarily adopted as an Order of this Court. The Court hereby preliminary certifies the following class: "all persons employed in California by Animal Behavior College, Inc. as Admissions Counselors at any time during the period between 12/11/2011, up to and including the date the Court grants preliminary approval of the Settlement". The Court hereby preliminarily appoints the Plaintiff SAMUEL BARAHONA as the Representative of the Class. The Court preliminarily appoints Michael L. Tracy as counsel to the Settlement Class. The Court finds that CPT Group, Inc. is qualified to act as the Claims Administrator for this settlement. The fairness hearing and hearing for Final Approval to be set forth in Class Notices is hereby scheduled for (at least 90 days after this order) 10/17/2016 at 10:00 AM. See document for further details. (gk) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/12 4:14 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real. The Court, having reviewed the parties' Stipulation to continue pretrial and trial dates (the "STIPULATION")22 , and good cause appearing, hereby orders asfollows: The Stipulation shall be and hereby is APPROVED IN PART. The Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before October 28, 2016. The pretrial conference order shall be lodged on or before October 31, 2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is continued to November 7, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. The trial date is continued to November 15, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Continue
Wed 07/06 6:03 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from 7/25/16 to 12/5/16 filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona.(Tracy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Certify Class Action
Mon 06/20 5:00 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class /Preliminary Approval of Settlement Class filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. Motion set for hearing on 7/18/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Manuel L. Real. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Tracy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 05/03 4:52 PM
ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING PRE-TRIAL & TRIAL DATES by Judge Manuel L. Real.COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that this action is hereby placed on calendar for FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE on July 25, 2016 AT 11:00 A.M. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit Lists and Witness Lists shall be filed and served on or before July 5, 2016, which date will also serve as the discovery cut-off date in this action. There is no Motion Cut-Off Date set. PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER shall be lodged with this Court on or before July 18, 2016. JURY TRIAL DATE is set as August 23, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cch) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 03/28 3:46 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT DEBBIE KENDRICK ONLY by Judge Manuel L. Real, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party18 : The Court, having reviewed the parties' stipulation to dismiss individual defendant Debbie Kendrick only (the "Stipulation"), and good cause appearing, hereby orders as follows: 1. The Stipulation shall be and hereby is APPROVED. 2. This action is hereby dismissed against individual defendant Debbie Kendrick only, with prejudice. (bm) |
|
Thursday, March 17, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Party
Thu 03/17 4:59 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Individual Defendant Debbie Kendrick filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona.(Tracy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 03/17 4:58 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan /joint report of early meeting of counsel and request for extension of motion filing date ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona..(Tracy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/07 3:20 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND FILING DATE OF JOINT REPORT OF EARLY MEETING OF COUNSEL AND CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION15 by Judge Manuel L. Real. hereby orders as follows: 1. The Stipulation is hereby APPROVED IN PART. 2. The filing deadlines of the Joint Report of Early Meeting of Counsel and Plaintiff's Rule 23 Motion for Class Certification are hereby extended 10 days from the date of this Order, until March 17, 2016. (lom) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 03/03 3:42 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File (1)Class Certification Motion, and (2)Joint Report of Early Meeting of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona.(Tracy, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 01/22 4:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona, upon Defendant Debbie Kendrick served on 1/5/2016, answer due 1/26/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Debbie Kendrick in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 01/22 4:46 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona, upon Defendant Animal Behavior College, Inc. served on 12/28/2015, answer due 1/19/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Candace Mason-Person in Charge of Office in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/19 3:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Animal Behavior College, Inc., Debbie Kendrick (Siegel, Adam) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 01/19 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Animal Behavior College, Inc., Debbie Kendrick, identifying Samuel Barahona, Animal Behavior College, Inc., Debbie Kendrick. (Siegel, Adam) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/19 2:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 .(Attorney Adam Yuda Siegel added to party Animal Behavior College, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Yuda Siegel added to party Debbie Kendrick(pty:dft))(Siegel, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 12/16 9:01 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Animal Behavior College, Inc., Debbie Kendrick. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 12/16 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)6 . Document number 6 due to clerical error. The wrong Case Number and Mag Judge initial was issued on the 21 Day Summons in error. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 12/15 4:14 PM
ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 12/14 12:20 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Animal Behavior College, Inc., Debbie Kendrick. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 12/14 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 12/11 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona, (Tracy, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 12/11 4:44 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 12/11 4:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. (Tracy, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 12/11 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16932518 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Samuel Barahona. (Attorney Michael L Tracy added to party Samuel Barahona(pty:pla))(Tracy, Michael) |