California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:15-cv-02063
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 11, 2015
Terminated:Jun 08, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2016 2:52 AM PDT
Defendant
GRENADE BEVERAGE LLC
Defendant
NICK SANDFORD
Defendant
Paul Sandford
Represented By
John J Gulino
contact info
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Grenade Beverage LLC
Represented By
John J Gulino
contact info
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Nick Sandford
Represented By
John J Gulino
contact info
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Grumpy Beverage, LLC
Represented By
Brian P Kinder
The Kinder Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
GRUMPY CAT LIMITED
Represented By
David Binder Jonelis
Lavely And Singer PC
contact info
Lindsay D Molnar
Lavely & Singer, P.C.
contact info
Martin D Singer
Lavely And Singer Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Grumpy Cat Limited
Represented By
David Binder Jonelis
Lavely And Singer PC
contact info
Lindsay D Molnar
Lavely & Singer, P.C.
contact info
Martin D Singer
Lavely And Singer Apc
contact info


1. Grumpy Cat wins $710,000 coffee lawsuit (bbc.com)
Submitted Wed 01/24/2018
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 28, 2019
209 209 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Thu 02/28 2:18 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re Judgment,,,153 filed by Counter Defendant Grumpy Cat Limited, Plaintiff Grumpy Cat Limited. (Jonelis, David)
Related: [-]