New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:15-cv-09746
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2015
Terminated:Sep 22, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2016 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Sterling Infosystems, Inc.
Represented By
Albert Edward Hartmann
Reed Smith Llp (chicago)
contact info
John Stephen Goetz
Fish & Richardson P.C. (nyc)
contact info
Michael Brett Johnson
Fish & Richardson P.C. (tx)
contact info
Michael Charles O'Neil
Reed Smith Llp (chicago)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ralph Gambles
Represented By
Joseph C Hashmall
contact info
Megan D Yelle
Nichols Kaster, Pllp
contact info
Michele Renee Fisher
Nichols Kaster, Pllp
contact info
Eleanor Michelle Drake
Berger & Montague P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 13, 2021
214 214 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/13 6:20 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION REGARDING SETTLEMENT FUND DISTRIBUTION AND JOINT STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS: Plaintiffs Ralph Gambles, Thomas Merck and Elsie Compo ("Plaintiffs") hereby submit the following report and motion. Defendant Sterling Infosystems, Inc. ("Defendant") has been informed of the substance of this filing and does not oppose the relief requested herein: (As further set forth herein.) IT IS SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:212 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion Regarding Settlement Fund Distribution and Proposed Joint Stipulated Order Regarding Distribution of Settlement Funds filed by Ralph Gambles, Thomas Merck, Elsie Compo. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/13/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
213 213 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 05/10 5:54 PM
DECLARATION of Ryan Chumley in Support re:212 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion Regarding Settlement Fund Distribution and Proposed Joint Stipulated Order Regarding Distribution of Settlement Funds .. Document filed by Elsie Compo, Ralph Gambles, Thomas Merck..(Drake, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
212 212 motion Settlement Mon 05/10 5:52 PM
MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion Regarding Settlement Fund Distribution and Proposed Joint Stipulated Order Regarding Distribution of Settlement Funds . Document filed by Elsie Compo, Ralph Gambles, Thomas Merck..(Drake, Eleanor)
Related: [-]