Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Case #: 5:15-cv-00298
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2015
Terminated:May 04, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jun 12, 2016 4:11 AM CDT
Defendant
INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Chief Counsel 1111 Constitution Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20224
Defendant
John Koskinen
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE P.O. BOX 61129
HOUSTON, TX 77208
Defendant
Internal Revenue Service
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jon E Fisher
Dept Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Bernhard Gubser
Represented By
Mackenzie Marie Martin
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
George M Clarke, III
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Brian J Hurst
Baker Mckenzie
contact info
Joseph B Judkins
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 12/18/2015 3:36 PM CST
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-15883289) filed by Bernhard Gubser.(Martin, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Internal Revenue Service, John Koskinen, and United States of America filed.(Martin, Mackenzie) Modified on 12/16/2015 (dmorales, 5).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
3 3 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Bernhard Gubser, filed.(Martin, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for George M. Clarke III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bernhard Gubser, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2016.(Martin, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1
5 5 MOTION Leave to Appear as Attorney-In-Charge for Plaintiff Bernhard Gubser by Bernhard Gubser, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2016.(Martin, Mackenzie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order