Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01464
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2015
Terminated:Apr 26, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jeff Wood, an individual
Represented By
Jeff Wood
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
16 16 court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/26 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1464 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, August 04, 2016
15 15 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 08/05 4:24 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Status Conference OFF CALENDAR; Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding that Does not Involve Claims under U.S.C. §727 filed 7/29/2016; No Answer Filed (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, July 29, 2016
14 14 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Fri 07/29 4:59 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding that Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. Section 727 Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2016
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 05/20 3:35 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] JOINT STATUS REPORT TO BE FILED BY 7/21/2016. CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 8/4/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Monday, May 16, 2016
12 12 misc Status report Mon 05/16 9:56 AM
Status report Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing Held (Adv Other)
Thursday, March 10, 2016
11 11 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 03/14 2:21 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - Status Conference Off Calendar; Another Summons Issues 3/1/2016; Status Conference Set for 5/19/2016 at 9:30 a.m. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, March 03, 2016
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 2:19 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, on Court's Own Motion. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
9 9 notice Notice Tue 03/01 4:13 PM
Notice to Defendants re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 8 Summons Service Executed on Jeff Wood 3/1/2016
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/01 4:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jeff Wood 3/1/2016 (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Another Summons Issued Tue 03/01 11:26 AM
Another Summons Issued on Jeff Wood Date Issued 3/1/2016, Answer Due 3/31/2016 Related [+]. Status Conference hearing to be held on 5/19/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Monday, February 29, 2016
6 6 misc Declaration Mon 02/29 6:51 PM
Declaration re: David A. Wood in Support of Request for Alias Summons with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 5 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP)
5 5 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Mon 02/29 6:47 PM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/19 5:10 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
3 3 misc Status report Thu 02/18 11:47 AM
Status report Unilateral Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 12/16 3:46 PM
Summons Issued on Jeff Wood Date Issued 12/16/2015, Answer Due 1/15/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/15 3:33 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01464. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against Jeff Wood. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Unauthorized Post-Petition Transfers [11 U.S.C. Sections 549, 550, and 551] Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet