New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine B Forrest
Case #: 1:15-cv-09763
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause18:1030 Fraud & Related Activity in Connection with Computers
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2015
Terminated:Feb 17, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jun 12, 2016 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Akiva Berman
Represented By
John Gregory Martin
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Jason Yin-Zen Hsi
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Marc Andrew Sittenreich
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
WDIT, Incorporated
Represented By
John Gregory Martin
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Jason Yin-Zen Hsi
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Marc Andrew Sittenreich
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Helix Systems, Inc.
Represented By
David J. Fryman
David J. Fryman, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Kalai
Represented By
David J. Fryman
David J. Fryman, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, December 08, 2023
33 33 misc Sealed Document Disposed Fri 12/08 10:17 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 29 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 12/08/2023..(jus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
32 32 misc Sealed Document Attorney Notice to Retrieve Thu 11/09 11:48 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 29 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 12/11/2023. .(jus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
31 31 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/18 5:23 PM
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above-entitled action, that no party being an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, or conservatee, and no person not a party having an interest in the subject matter of the action, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs in accordance with Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/18/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2016
30 30 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/17 6:31 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai.(Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
29 29 misc Sealed Document Wed 02/10 3:32 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/01 11:29 AM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. Reply due by 2/12/2016., Responses due by 2/5/2016. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/1/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2016
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/28 3:11 PM
THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from John G. Martin dated January 28, 2016., THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from John G. Martin dated January 28, 2016.( Return Date set for 4/8/2016 at 09:30 AM.) Document filed by WDIT, Incorporated.(Martin, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 01/22 9:59 AM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time.Ordered: Granted. Schedule adjusted for opposition to be due 1/29 and reply 2/8. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/21/2016) (mro)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/22 10:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/29/2016 Replies due by 2/8/2016. (mro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
25 25 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/21 5:05 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on expedited discovery and briefing schedule addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from John G. Martin dated January 21, 2016. Document filed by WDIT, Incorporated.(Martin, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/20 11:24 AM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/20/2016) (mro)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/15 2:07 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from David J. Fryman dated January 15, 2016., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Set/Reset Deadlines, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,18 Order on Motion to Expedite, addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from David J. Fryman dated January 15, 2016. Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai.(Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2015
20 20 order Order on Motion to Seal Document Mon 12/28 4:28 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Seal Document. ORDERED: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/28/2015) (cf)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Seal Document Mon 12/28 2:09 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Seal Document3 Order,,,, addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from David J. Fryman dated December 28, 2015. Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai.(Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Expedite Mon 12/28 11:18 AM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion to Expedite. Schedule adopted as set forth herein. A hearing on the motion for preliminary injunctive relief has been scheduled for Friday, April 8, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall confer and inform the Court as to whether live testimony shall be presented at such hearing, not later than March 15, 2016. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/28/2015) (lmb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/28 11:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Cross Motions due by 3/11/2016., Deposition due by 2/12/2016., Motions due by 2/26/2016., Responses due by 3/18/2016., Replies due by 3/25/2016.), ( Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 24, 2015
17 17 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 12/24 3:37 PM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by WDIT, Incorporated.(Sittenreich, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum Of Law
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
16 16 motion Expedite Wed 12/23 5:17 PM
LETTER MOTION to Expedite Discovery Schedule and briefing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jason Hsi dated December 23, 2015. Document filed by Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated.(Hsi, Jason)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/23 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Andrew Sittenreich on behalf of Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (Sittenreich, Marc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 12/18 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David J. Fryman on behalf of Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai. New Address: Gulko Schwed LLP, 44 Wall Street, Second Floor, New York, NY, USA 10005, 212-500-1312. (Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 respoth Declaration in Opposition (non-motion) Fri 12/18 11:59 AM
DECLARATION of Akiva Berman in Opposition re:3 Order,,,,. Document filed by Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (Hsi, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs respoth Affidavit in Opposition (non-motion) Fri 12/18 11:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Akiva Berman in Opposition re:3 Order,,,,. Document filed by Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (Hsi, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs respoth Affidavit in Opposition (non-motion) Fri 12/18 11:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Larry Frydman in Opposition re:3 Order,,,,. Document filed by Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (Hsi, Jason)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/18 11:41 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated.(Hsi, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
9 9 respoth Declaration (non-motion) Thu 12/17 7:12 PM
DECLARATION of David J. Fryman re:3 Order,,,, . Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai. (Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Thu 12/17 7:10 PM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:3 Order,,,, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai. (Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs respoth Affidavit in Support (non-motion) Thu 12/17 7:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Kalai in Support re:3 Order,,,,. Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai.(Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
6 6 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/17 6:24 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc..(Fryman, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/17 12:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Gregory Martin on behalf of Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (Martin, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/17 12:29 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Yin-Zen Hsi on behalf of Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (Hsi, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Thu 12/17 10:01 AM
ORDER: On December 16, 2015, the Court held a hearing in the above-referenced matter. As stated on the record, Mr. Berman will submit an affidavit to the Court not later than 1:00 p.m. today, Thursday, December 17, 2015. As further stated on the record, the evidence submitted does not support the issuance of a temporary restraining order at this time. Plaintiff's motion for such relief is therefore DENIED. Any motion regarding subject matter jurisdiction may be made at any time. The parties shall confer and provide the Court with a proposed schedule for initial, expedited discovery, a proposed schedule for briefing an anticipated renewed motion for a preliminary injunction, and a date after which the parties shall be available for a hearing on such motion. The parties shall file this schedule on ECF not later than Wednesday, December 23, 2015. Finally, the Court reminds the parties that all materials that have been filed to the Court in this matter must be filed to the ECF public docket as well. Documents containing confidential information may be filed under seal. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/17/2015) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/16 9:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/16 9:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401141182)Document filed by Helix Systems, Inc., Daniel Kalai.(moh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 12/16 9:06 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Akiva Berman, WDIT, Incorporated. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 12/16 9:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 12/16 9:06 AM
Case Designated ECF. (moh)
Related: [-]
minutes Show Cause Hearing Wed 12/16 10:03 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine B. Forrest: Hearing held on 12/15/2015. (jp)
Related: [-]