Patton v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terry R Means |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-00955 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2016 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Patton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Wed 01/04 4:56 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, all claims are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to their refiling. All costs of Court under 28 U.S.C. § 1920 shall be borne, as agreed by the parties, by the party incurring same. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/4/2017) (hth) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Wed 01/04 4:54 PM
Order of Dismissal: IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, that this lawsuit and all claims asserted therein, or which could be asserted by Plaintiff therein, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to the rights of Plaintiff to file, refile or reinstate the same or any part thereof in this or any other court, tribunal or forum. IT IS ORDERED that each party shall bear their or its own costs. All relief not expressly granted herein is DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/4/2017) (hth) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Thu 12/15 12:37 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Zoys, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal | ||
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Settlement Conference Report
Fri 11/11 11:46 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Zoys, James) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 11/07 3:27 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jacob Patton. (Richard, Scott) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Settlement Conference Report
Mon 11/07 3:24 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Jacob Patton. (Richard, Scott) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 11/03 3:58 PM
ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR. Jim Hitzelberger is APPOINTED AS MEDIATOR in this case. The mediation proceedings are scheduled to commence on January 3, 2017, at the office of and at the direction of Mediator. Further, it is ORDERED that Mediator file the ADR Summary no later than 1/10/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 11/3/2016) (trt) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
adr
Designation of Mediator
Tue 11/01 10:09 AM
Designation of Mediator by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Zoys, James) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order For ADR
Fri 06/24 11:38 AM
ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION IN JANUARY 2017: The parties are to select or designate a mediator. The parties are to complete mediation during the month of January. ADR Summary provided as Exhibit B to the order. Deadline for parties to designate a mediator is on or before 11/1/2016. ADR Summary form due 2/7/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/24/2016) (tln) |
|
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 06/24 11:33 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 8/18/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2016. Discovery due by 1/17/2017. Motions due by 2/17/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/24/2016) (tln) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Tue 06/21 10:07 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT and discovery plan filed by Jacob Patton. (Richard, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, May 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Status Report Order
Tue 05/31 9:23 AM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (See Order for further specifics.) (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/31/2016) (hth) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Thu 05/26 4:43 PM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (doc.5 ). After review of the motion, the response in opposition, Plaintiff's original petition, and the applicable law, the Court concludes that the motion should be and hereby is DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/26/2016) (hth) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 02/01 1:42 PM
RESPONSE filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC re:5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Zoys, James) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 01/15 10:43 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint,, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Waters, Nancy) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 01/11 1:58 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacob Patton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Richard, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 12/29 4:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC filed by Jacob Patton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Richard, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment | ||
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Means
Wed 12/16 4:23 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 12/16 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Waters, Nancy) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 12/16 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 153rd Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, TX, case number 153-282084-15 filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-7256345) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Waters, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX IN SUPPORT - INDEX, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 1-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 3-7, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 8, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 9-10, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 11, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 12-13, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 14, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 15, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) APPEN DIX 16-17, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 18, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 19, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 20, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 21-23, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 24, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 25, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 26-28, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 29-33, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 34, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 35, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit(s) APPENDIX 36-42, | ||
Att: 22 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 23 Cover Sheet Supplement |