Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01465
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2015
Terminated:Apr 26, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fallbrook Hospital Corporation, a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Fallbrook Hospital Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/26 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1465 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, September 01, 2016
12 12 court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 09/06 5:21 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held Related [+] - OFF CALENDAR; Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding that Does not Involve Claims under 11 U.S.C. Section 727 filed 6/29/16; No Answer Filed (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, June 30, 2016
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 07/01 5:12 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] RULING: Continue status conference to Sept. 1, 2016 at 9:30 a.m.; updated status report to be filed by Aug. 18, 2016 if adversary is still pending as of that date.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Wed 06/29 5:27 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding that Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. Section 727; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
9 9 misc Status report Thu 06/16 12:07 PM
Status report Unilateral Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 8 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, June 09, 2016
8 8 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 06/10 7:51 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 on Court's Own Motion. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Monday, June 06, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/06 3:46 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 5:48 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. A motion for default judgment may self-calendared for the same date/time as the continued Status Conference date. Alternatively, the motion may be filed without a hearing pursuant to the procedure set forth in Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1(o).The motion for default judgment, supported by evidence, must be served on defendant and defendant's counsel in accordance with Local Rule 9013-1(d). If the motion for default judgment is not heard by the continued date of the Status Conference, THE ADVERSARY MAY BE DISMISSED at the Status Conference for failure to prosecute. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, February 25, 2016
5 5 misc Status report Thu 02/25 11:02 AM
Status report Unilateral Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Wed 12/23 6:34 PM
Notice to Defendant re Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/23 6:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fallbrook Hospital Corporation 12/23/2015 (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 12/17 2:30 PM
Summons Issued on Fallbrook Hospital Corporation Date Issued 12/17/2015, Answer Due 1/19/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/17 10:35 AM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01465. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against Fallbrook Hospital Corporation. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservaton of Fraudulent Transfers [11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 548, 550 and 551, and Cal. Civ. Pro. Sections 3439.04, 3439.05, et al.] Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet