Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01466
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2015
Terminated:Jun 27, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lincoln Automotive Financial Services
Represented By
Lincoln Automotive Financial Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
49 49 court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/27 9:04 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1466 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
48 48 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 06/16 3:24 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held Related [+] - OFF CALENDAR; Order Approving Order Dismissing Adversary Entered 6/22/2017. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 06/14 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Monday, June 12, 2017
46 46 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Mon 06/12 10:31 AM
ORDER Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. The Adversary Case is Dismissed with Prejudice and Closed; the Parties Shall Bear Their Own Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred in Connection with the Adversary Case; and the Status Conference Currently Set for 6/15/2017, is Hereby Vacated and Taken Off Calendar (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/12/2017 Related [+]. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, June 01, 2017
45 45 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 06/01 3:27 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
44 44 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 04/21 2:22 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/15/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 4/11/2017. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
43 43 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 04/21 2:21 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held Related [+] - OFF CALENDAR; Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed 3/29/2017. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) (holding date only)
Thursday, April 13, 2017
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/13 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
41 41 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Tue 04/11 2:13 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue the April 20, 2017, Status Conference. The Status Conference Scheduled for April 20, 2017, is CONTINUED TO JUNE 15, 2017, at 9:30 a.m.; and The Parties Will Comply with the Local Bankruptcy Rules by Timely Filing a Joint Status Report in Advance of the Continued Status Conference Hearing (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/11/2017 (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 40
40 40 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 04/11 1:52 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue the April 20, 2017, Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
39 39 notice Notice Wed 03/29 9:04 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) Filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services Related [+]. (Mroczynski, Randall)
Related: [-] 5 Motion and Notice of Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) Filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities # 2 Declaration of Tiffany Didur) filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services
Thursday, February 16, 2017
38 38 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 02/17 3:30 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] RULING: STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 4/20/17 AT 9:30AM PER ORDER ENTERED 2/3/17.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
37 37 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 02/17 3:29 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] RULING: STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 4/20/17 AT 9:30AM PER ORDER ENTERED 2/3/17.
Related: [-] 5 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Servicesid, Rick
Sunday, February 05, 2017
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 02/05 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, February 03, 2017
35 35 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 02/03 4:37 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE FOLLOWING HEARINGS: 1) DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; AND 2) STATUS CONFERENCE [April 20, 2017 at 9:30am in Courtroom 5A] (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/3/2017
Related: [-] 34 id, Rick
34 34 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 02/03 2:23 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue the Following Hearings: 1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint; and 2) Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
33 33 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 12/27 10:33 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 2/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 12/9/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
32 32 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 12/27 10:32 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing RE: Defendant's Motion CONTINUED TO 2/16/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 12/9/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) (holding date only), filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services
Sunday, December 11, 2016
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 12/11 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/11/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, December 09, 2016
30 30 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 12/09 10:09 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE FOLLOWING HEARINGS: 1) DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AND THIRD CAUSES OF ACTION OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; AND 2) STATUS CONFERENCE (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/9/2016
Related: [-] 29 id, Rick
Thursday, December 08, 2016
29 29 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 12/08 11:35 AM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendants to Continue the Following Hearings; 1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint; and 2) Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2016
28 28 court Hearing Continued (Other) Wed 10/19 2:49 PM
Hearing Continued PER ORDER ENTERED 10/11/16 (XX) Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
27 27 court Hearing Continued (Other) Wed 10/19 2:47 PM
Hearing Continued PER ORDER ENTERED 10/11/16 (XX) Related [+] CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 12/22/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 10/13 10:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/13/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
25 25 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 10/11 10:48 AM
Order Granting Stipulation to Continue the following hearings: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss currently set for hearing on 10/13/2016 at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED to 12/22/2016 at 9:30 a.m. as a Holding Date Only; The Status Conference scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 9:30 a.m, is CONTINUED to 12/22/2016 at 9:30 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 10/11/2016 (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, October 10, 2016
24 24 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 10/10 9:55 AM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue the Following Hearings: 1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint; and 2) Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2016
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 08/05 4:29 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 10/13/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701; updated status report must be filed by 9/25/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
22 22 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 08/05 4:28 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing CONTINUED TO 10/13/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701; updated status report must be filed by 9/25/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services
Thursday, July 28, 2016
21 21 misc Status report Thu 07/28 4:13 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 19 Status report
Monday, July 25, 2016
20 20 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 07/25 12:01 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT WITH CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. Hearing set for 8/4/16. Related [+] (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 19 Status report filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, July 22, 2016
19 19 misc Status report Fri 07/22 3:38 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David) WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry no: 20 Modified on 7/25/2016 (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 18 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, May 19, 2016
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 05/20 3:53 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Joint Status Report to be filed by July 21, 2016; CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 8/4/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 05/20 3:38 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] The CONTINUED Hearing date is set for 8/4/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 5 RE: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss The First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6); filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services
Thursday, May 12, 2016
16 16 misc Status report Thu 05/12 2:51 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 15 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, April 21, 2016
15 15 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 04/22 3:54 PM
Hearing Continued PER ORDER ENTERED 4/11/16 Related [+] CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 5/19/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
14 14 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Fri 04/22 3:53 PM
Hearing Continued AS A HOLDING DATE ONLY. Related [+]
Related: [-] 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b0(6); filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services) The CONTINUED Hearing date is set for 5/19/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/13 9:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/13/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, April 11, 2016
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 04/11 9:40 AM
Order approving stipulation to continue the following hearings: 1) Motion to dismiss the complaint; 2) Status conference [May 19, 2016 at 9:30am in Courtroom 5A] Related [+] Signed on 4/11/2016
Related: [-] 11 id, Rick
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 04/06 6:07 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue the Following Hearings 1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint; and 2. Status Conference; with Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 5:50 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference CONTINUED TO held on 4/21/2016 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, same date/time as hearing on pending 12(b)(6) motion. Updated status report not requied. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Monday, February 29, 2016
9 9 misc Status report Mon 02/29 7:17 PM
Status report Joint Status Report with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
8 8 court Hearing Set (Motion) Wed 01/20 10:17 AM
Hearing Set Related [+]. The Hearing date is set for 4/21/2016 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services
7 7 misc Proof of service Tue 01/19 4:16 PM
Proof of service Filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services Related [+]. (Mroczynski, Randall)
Related: [-] 5 Motion and Notice of Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) ,6 Request for judicial notice
6 6 misc Request for judicial notice Tue 01/19 4:15 PM
Request for judicial notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6)) Filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services Related [+]. (Mroczynski, Randall)
Related: [-] 5 Motion and Notice of Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6)
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
5 5 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Tue 01/19 4:12 PM
Motion and Notice of Motion to Dismiss the First and Third Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 12(b)(6) Filed by Defendant Lincoln Automotive Financial Services (Mroczynski, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Att: 2 Declaration of Tiffany Didur
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Wed 12/23 6:37 PM
Notice to Defendant re Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/23 6:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Lincoln Automotive Financial Services 12/23/2015 (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 12/17 2:32 PM
Summons Issued on Lincoln Automotive Financial Services Date Issued 12/17/2015, Answer Due 1/19/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/17 11:25 AM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01466. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against Lincoln Automotive Financial Services. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Preferential, Fraudulent, and Unauthorized Post-Petition Transfers and Objection to Claim [11 U.S.C. Sections 502, 544, 547, 548, 549, 550 and 551, and Cal. Civl Pro. Sections 3439.04, 3439.05, et al.] Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet