Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01468
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2015
Terminated:May 15, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Centurion Bank
Represented By
American Express Centurion Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 15, 2017
22 22 court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/15 11:11 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1468 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
21 21 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 12/19 5:50 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - OFF CALENDAR: Order Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Entered 11/8/2016 (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 10, 2016
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 11/10 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/10/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
19 19 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Tue 11/08 10:16 AM
ORDER Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. The Adversary Case is Dismissed with Prejudice and Closed; The Parties Shall Bear their own Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred in Connection with the Adversary Case. The Status Conference Currently Set for 12/15/2016, is Vacated and Taken Off Calendar (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/8/2016 Related [+]. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack,8 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, November 04, 2016
17 17 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 11/04 4:18 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendants for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 11/07 11:00 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Continue status conference one final time to December 15, 2016 at 9:30 am. If it is the desire of the parties to dismiss this adversary proceeding with prejudice rather than without prejudice per the Order drafted and lodged by the parties, then a stipulation re dismissal of adversary with prejudice needs to be fled no later than December 1, 2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, October 20, 2016
16 16 misc Status report Thu 10/20 5:52 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 15 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, September 01, 2016
15 15 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 09/06 5:22 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 11/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 8/29/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 08/31 10:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/31/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, August 29, 2016
13 13 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 08/29 2:21 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Status Conference [November 3, 2016 at 9:30am in Courtroom 5A] (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/29/2016
Related: [-] 12 id, Rick
12 12 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 08/29 12:53 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue Status Conference; with Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 07/01 5:13 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] RULING: Continue status conference to Sept. 1, 2016 at 9:30 a.m.; updated status report to be filed by Aug. 18, 2016 if adversary is still pending as of that date.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Thursday, June 16, 2016
10 10 misc Status report Thu 06/16 3:40 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 9 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, June 09, 2016
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 06/10 7:52 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 on Court's Own Motion. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Monday, June 06, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/06 3:38 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
7 7 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 5:51 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701; updated Joint Status Report to be filed by 5/26/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, February 25, 2016
6 6 misc Status report Thu 02/25 2:24 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, January 15, 2016
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/15 6:04 PM
Answer to Complaint - Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by American Express Centurion Bank.(Lampl, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, December 22, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Tue 12/22 11:13 AM
Notice to Defendant re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof of service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/22 11:11 AM
Summons Service Executed on American Express Centurion Bank 12/22/2015 (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 12/17 3:37 PM
Summons Issued on American Express Centurion Bank Date Issued 12/17/2015, Answer Due 1/19/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/17 12:17 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01468. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against American Express Centurion Bank. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Preferential, Fraudulent, and Unauthorized Post-Petition Transfers [11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548, 549, 550 and 551, and Cal. Civ. Pro. Sections 3439.04, 3439.05, et al.] Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet