Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01469
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2015
Terminated:May 24, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jane Lee, an individual
Represented By
Jane Lee
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
35 35 court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/24 9:17 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1469 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
34 34 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 09/23 1:41 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] RULING: OFF CALENDAR: Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment and Judgment Entered 8/4/16.
Related: [-] 1 Status Conference on Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Thursday, September 08, 2016
33 33 misc Status report Thu 09/08 1:59 PM
Status report Unilateral Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 26 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Saturday, August 06, 2016
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 08/06 9:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/06/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 08/06 9:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/06/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, August 04, 2016
30 30 order JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Thu 08/04 3:55 PM
JUDGMENT is Entered in Favor of the Plaintiff and Against Defendant Jane Lee in the amount of $30,000.00 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/4/2016. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Rick
29 29 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Thu 08/04 3:52 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/4/2016.
Related: [-] 24 id, Rick
28 28 misc Proof of service Thu 08/04 11:28 AM
Proof of service Amended Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 27 Declaration re: non opposition
27 27 misc Declaration re: non opposition Thu 08/04 11:11 AM
Declaration re: non opposition with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 24 Motion for Default Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment; Declaration of Richard A. Marshack in support; with Proof of Service
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, July 21, 2016
26 26 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 07/29 10:58 AM
Hearing Continued; UPDATED STATUS REPORT SHALL BE FILED BY SEPTEMBER 8, 2016 IF THE ADVERSARY IS STILL PENDING BY SUCH DATE (XX) Related [+] CONTINUED Status hearing to be held on 9/22/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, July 14, 2016
25 25 misc Status report Thu 07/14 11:16 AM
Status report Unilateral Status Report with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
24 24 motion Default Judgment (motion) Wed 07/13 2:08 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment; Declaration of Richard A. Marshack in support; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Default Judgment Motion due by 08/12/2016. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Sunday, July 03, 2016
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 07/03 9:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/03/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Friday, July 01, 2016
22 22 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Fri 07/01 5:52 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Jane Lee Related [+] (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 20 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
21 21 misc Declaration Wed 06/29 4:12 PM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default Re: Defendant Lane; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 20 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Friday, June 24, 2016
20 20 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Fri 06/24 5:20 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Jane Lee Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 06/22 10:04 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Monday, June 20, 2016
18 18 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Mon 06/20 5:57 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Jane Lee, an individual, Related [+] (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 16 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, June 17, 2016
17 17 misc Declaration Fri 06/17 12:18 PM
Declaration re: Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default re: Defendant Jane Lee; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 16 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
16 16 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Fri 06/17 12:12 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Jane Lee Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2016
15 15 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 05/06 2:20 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] RULING: OFF CALENDAR; Another Summons Issued 5-3-16 per Request filed 5-2-16; Status Conference re-set for 7-21-16 at 9:30am.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
14 14 notice Notice Wed 05/04 3:40 PM
Notice to Defendant re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 05/04 3:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jane Lee 5/4/2016 (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
12 12 court Another Summons Issued Tue 05/03 2:47 PM
Another Summons Issued on Jane Lee Date Issued 5/3/2016, Answer Due 6/2/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/21/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith
Related: [-] 9 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Monday, May 02, 2016
11 11 misc Status report Mon 05/02 11:32 AM
Status report Unilateral Status Report with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-] 8 Hearing Held (Adv Other)
10 10 misc Declaration Mon 05/02 10:29 AM
Declaration re: Matthew W. Grimshaw in support of Request for Alias Summons with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-] 9 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP)
9 9 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Mon 05/02 10:21 AM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
8 8 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 03/14 5:52 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] Complaint) - OFF CALENDAR; Another Summons Issued 2/10/2016 Setting Status Conference for 5/5/2016 at 9:30 a.m. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
7 7 notice Notice Wed 02/10 1:04 PM
Notice to Defendant re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptsy Rules; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/10 1:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jane Lee 2/10/2016 (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Another Summons Issued Wed 02/10 10:38 AM
Another Summons Issued on Jane Lee Date Issued 2/10/2016, Answer Due 3/11/2016 Related [+]. Status Conference hearing to be held on 5/5/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
4 4 misc Declaration Tue 02/09 5:25 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of David A. Wood In Support of Request for Alias Summons and Notice of Status COnfernece in Adversary Proceeding; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 3 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP)
3 3 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Tue 02/09 5:23 PM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 12/18 11:23 AM
Summons Issued on Jane Lee Date Issued 12/18/2015, Answer Due 1/19/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, December 17, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/17 3:53 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01469. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against Jane Lee. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Preferential, and Fraudulent Transfers [11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 548, 549, 550 and 551, and Cal. Civ. Code Sections 3439.04, et al.] Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet