Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01470
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2015
Terminated:Aug 05, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
BMW Bank of North America
Represented By
BMW Bank of North America
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, August 05, 2016
27 27 court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/05 12:39 PM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1470 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
26 26 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 07/29 4:34 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] OFF CALENDAR - ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY SIGNED 7/22/16. (Le, James)
Related: [-] 1 CON'TD STATUS CONFERENCE RE: Complaint for avoidance, recovery, and preservation of preferential, fraudulent, and unauthorized post-petition transfers and objection to claim
Sunday, July 24, 2016
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 07/24 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Friday, July 22, 2016
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Fri 07/22 1:31 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 7/22/2016 Related [+] . (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 23 ,1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
23 23 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 07/12 4:22 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and BMW Bank of North America for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2016
22 22 misc Status report Thu 06/16 6:07 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 21 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, May 12, 2016
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 05/16 2:52 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] In light of anticipated settlement, continue status conference to 7/28/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701; updated status report must be filed by July 14, 2016 if the adversary proceeding has not been dismissed by such date. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, April 29, 2016
20 20 misc Status report Fri 04/29 3:25 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 19 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, March 10, 2016
19 19 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 5:53 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 5/12/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 3/2/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, March 04, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/04 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
17 17 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 03/02 3:06 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Status Conference [May 12, 2016 at 9:30am in Courtroom 5A] Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2016
Related: [-] 16 id, Rick
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
16 16 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 03/01 11:28 AM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendants to Continue the March 10, 2016 Status Conference with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 21, 2016
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 02/21 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Extend Time (BNC-PDF)
Friday, February 19, 2016
14 14 order Extend Time (BNC-PDF) Fri 02/19 3:36 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation to Extend Defenants' Deadline to File and Serve a Written Response to Complaint from February 16, 2016 to March 10, 2016. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/19/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, February 18, 2016
13 13 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 02/18 2:45 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding Re: Third Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve Written Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America Related [+]. (Caley, Rebecca)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation By BMW Bank of North America and Trustee (Third Stipulation) to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve Written Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America
12 12 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 02/18 2:42 PM
Stipulation By BMW Bank of North America and Trustee (Third Stipulation) to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve Written Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America (Caley, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/05 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/05/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Extend Time (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
10 10 order Extend Time (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/03 1:47 PM
Order Approving Second Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve a Written Response to Complaint from February 2, 2016 to February 16, 2016. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/3/2016 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
9 9 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 02/02 4:28 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Re: Second Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve Written Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America Related [+].(Caley, Rebecca)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation By BMW Bank of North America and Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee entitled Second Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve Written Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Approving Second Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve a Written Response to Complaint
8 8 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 02/02 4:17 PM
Stipulation By BMW Bank of North America and Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee entitled Second Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve Written Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant BMW Bank of North America (Caley, Rebecca) - NOTE: The time listed on the document should reflect 9:30 a.m. - Modified on 2/3/2016 (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/22 9:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/20 2:51 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File and Serve a Written Response to Complaint Related [+] Signed on 1/20/2016
Related: [-] 5 id, Rick
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
5 5 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 01/19 4:42 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File and Serve a Written Response to Complaint; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Wed 12/23 6:29 PM
Notice to Defendant Re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/23 6:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on BMW Bank of North America 12/23/2015 (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 12/18 11:38 AM
Summons Issued on BMW Bank of North America Date Issued 12/18/2015, Answer Due 1/19/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, December 17, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/17 5:58 PM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01470. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against BMW Bank of North America. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Preferential, Fraudulent, and Unauthorized Post-Petiton Transfers and Objection to Claim [11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 547, 548, 549, 550, and 551 and Cal. Civ Code Sections 3439.04, 3439.05, et al.] Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet