Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-17920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:15-ap-01471
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2015
Terminated:Oct 02, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sang Paik, an individual
Represented By
Sang Paik
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Chapter 7 Trustee
870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
Represented By
Matthew Grimshaw
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
David Wood
Marshack Hays LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, October 19, 2017
42 42 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 10/20 4:41 PM
Hearing Held RE: STATUS CONFERENCE RE:1 Complaint - OFF CALENDAR: Order Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Entered 9/18/2017 (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2017
41 41 court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/02 3:34 PM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-1471 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2017
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 09/20 9:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Monday, September 18, 2017
39 39 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Mon 09/18 3:57 PM
ORDER Approving Stipulation for Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. It is ORDERED: The Adversary Case is Dismissed with Prejudice and Closed; the Parties Shall Bear their own Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred in Connection with the Adversary Case; and the Status Conference Currently Set for October 19, 2017, is Vacated and Taken Off Calendar (BNC-PDF) Signed on 9/18/2017 Related [+]. (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack,12 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack,14 Status report filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
38 38 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 09/18 9:05 AM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Dr. Sang Paik to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
37 37 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 08/21 9:29 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 10/19/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 8/3/2017. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Saturday, August 05, 2017
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 08/05 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, August 03, 2017
35 35 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 08/03 10:49 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. The Status Conference Currently Scheduloed for August 17, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED TO October 19, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.; A Joint Status Report Shall be Filed by October 5, 2017. This Stipulation is Without Prejudice to the Parties Stipulating or Seeking Further Extensions of the Deadline, if Necessary (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/3/2017 (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 34
34 34 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 08/03 9:58 AM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
33 33 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 06/16 3:25 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 8/17/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 6/1/2017. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Saturday, June 03, 2017
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 06/03 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/03/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, June 01, 2017
31 31 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 06/01 3:46 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. The Status Conference Currently Scheduled for Juen 15, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED TO August 17, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.; A Joint Status Report Shall be Filed by August 2, 2017; and This Stipulation is Without Prejudice to the Parties Stipulating or Seeking Further Extensions of the Deadline, if Necessary (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/1/2017 (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 30
30 30 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 06/01 3:19 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
29 29 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 04/17 11:51 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/15/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 3/27/2017. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 03/29 9:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, March 27, 2017
27 27 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 03/27 9:35 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Status Conference (June 15, 2017 at 9:30am) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/27/2017
Related: [-] 26 id, Rick
Friday, March 24, 2017
26 26 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 03/24 5:41 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2017
25 25 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 02/06 4:08 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] RULING: CONTINUED TO APRIL 13, 2017 AT 9:30 A.M. PER ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION ENTERED 1/19/17.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Saturday, January 21, 2017
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/21 9:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 19, 2017
23 23 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Thu 01/19 9:25 AM
Order Approving Stipultation to Continue Status Conference From February 2, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. to April 13, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. A Joint Status Report Shall be filed by March 30, 2017. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/19/2017 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
22 22 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 01/18 4:06 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
21 21 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 11/07 11:06 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Continue status conference one final time to February 2, 2017 at 9:30 am; updated status report must be filed no later than January 19, 2017. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Daniels, Sally)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Thursday, October 20, 2016
20 20 misc Status report Thu 10/20 5:32 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 19 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, September 01, 2016
19 19 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 09/06 5:23 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 11/3/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701, Per Order Entered 8/29/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 08/31 10:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/31/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Monday, August 29, 2016
17 17 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Mon 08/29 10:57 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. The Status Conference Currently Scheduled for 9/1/2016 at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED TO 11/3/2016 at 9:30 a.m.; An Updated Status Report Shall be Filed by 10/20/2016 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/29/2016 (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, August 26, 2016
16 16 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 08/26 2:43 PM
Stipulation By Richard A. Marshack and Defendant to Continue Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
15 15 court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 07/05 8:50 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+] RULING: Continue status conference to Sept. 1, 2016 at 9:30 a.m.; updated status report to be filed by Aug. 18, 2016.
Related: [-] 14 Status report filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
Thursday, June 16, 2016
14 14 misc Status report Thu 06/16 5:40 PM
Status report ; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 13 Hearing (Adv Other) Continued
Thursday, June 09, 2016
13 13 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 06/10 7:53 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/30/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 on Court's Own Motion. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Monday, June 06, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/06 3:33 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Status Conference; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2016
11 11 court Hearing Held (Other) Mon 03/28 8:43 AM
Document / Hearing Held re Settlement Conference. Vacated at request of parties, to be reset at a later date (Moser, Renee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2016
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 03/14 5:54 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - Status Conference hearing CONTINUED TO 6/9/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701; updated Joint Status Report to be filed by 5/26/2016. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith (Duarte, Tina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Friday, March 04, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 03/04 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 03/02 11:12 AM
Order Assigning Matter to Mediation Program and Appointing Mediator and Alternate Mediator (Mediator: Hon. Judge Jury) Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2016
Related: [-] 7 id, Rick
Thursday, February 25, 2016
7 7 motion Request for assignment to mediation program (motion) Thu 02/25 5:07 PM
Request for Assignment to Mediation Program ; Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack (Wood, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Status report Thu 02/25 2:55 PM
Status report Joint Status Report; with Proof of Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Wood, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/19 8:10 PM
Answer to Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Fraudulent Transfers, with proof of service Filed by Sang Paik. (Wuhrman, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
4 4 notice Notice Wed 12/23 6:41 PM
Notice to Defendant re Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules; with Proof Service Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/23 6:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sang Paik 12/23/2015 (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 12/18 3:08 PM
Summons Issued on Sang Paik Date Issued 12/18/2015, Answer Due 1/19/2016 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/10/2016 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Erithe A. Smith
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshackid, Rick
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/18 10:09 AM
Adversary case 8:15-ap-01471. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack against Sang Paik. (Charge To Estate). Complaint for Avoidance, Recovery, and Preservation of Fraudulent Transfers [11 U.S.C. Sections 544, 548, 550, and 551, and Cal. Civ. Code Sections 3439.04, 3439.05, et al.] Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Grimshaw, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet