Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:William O Bertelsman
Referred: J Gregory Wehrman
Case #: 2:15-cv-00212
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2015
Terminated:Mar 09, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 14, 2016 5:25 AM EDT
Defendant
R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Harmon
Cors & Bassett, Llc - Cincinnati Oh
contact info
Defendant
R & L Transfer, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Harmon
Cors & Bassett, Llc - Cincinnati Oh
contact info
Defendant
Steven S. Simms
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Harmon
Cors & Bassett, Llc - Cincinnati Oh
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa T. Muvich
Represented By
Marcus S. Schulte
Schulte Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Kathy M. Upton
Schulte Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, March 09, 2016
14 14 order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 03/09 2:25 PM
ORDER: The Jt Motion to Remand13 is granted and this action is remanded to the Kenton Circuit Court for further proceedings. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/9/2016. (ECO)cc: COR & Kenton Circuit Court (certified copy w/docket sheet)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Note Wed 03/09 10:37 AM
Clerk's Note: re13 JOINT MOTION to Remand to State Court by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms. Call to Jeffrey Harmon and verified that page 3 of Proposed Order DE 13-1 is indeed a blank page. (TED)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2016
13 13 motion Remand to State Court Tue 03/08 2:56 PM
JOINT MOTION to Remand to State Court by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms(Harmon, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Remand
utility Motion Submitted Tue 03/08 3:47 PM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of JUDGE BERTELSMAN for review: re13 JOINT MOTION to Remand to State Court by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms (TED)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/27 10:50 AM
ORDER: That DOCKET CALL is set for 2/10/2016 at 01:00 PM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/27/2016.(ECO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2015
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/31 5:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms.(Harmon, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Thu 12/31 4:24 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.. (Harmon, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Thu 12/31 4:10 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R & L Transfer, Inc.. (Harmon, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2015
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/28 11:14 AM
ORDER: granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms . It is ordered that Defendants' motion is granted and Defendants shall have up to and including December 31, 2015 within which to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman on 12/28/2015. (TED)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Mon 12/28 10:22 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of MAGISTRATE WEHRMAN for review: re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms (TED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 24, 2015
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/24 1:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms Motions referred to J. Gregory Wehrman.(Harmon, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 18, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 12/18 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jeffrey J. Harmon.1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by R & L Transfer, Inc. and R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (TED)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Other Notice Fri 12/18 10:41 AM
NOTICE by R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., R & L Transfer, Inc., Steven S. Simms re1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Harmon, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Fri 12/18 10:16 AM
Conflict Check run. (TED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
3 3 order Order Fri 12/18 10:15 AM
STANDING REFRRAL ORDER referring case to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and other pretrial proceedings, unless altered by subsequent Order. The parties shall comply with paragraphs 1-2 of Standing Referral Order. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(TED)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 12/18 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, Div 1, case number 15-CI-2134. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3375567), filed by R & L Transfer, Inc., R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C., Steven S. Simms.(TED) (TED)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court record,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court record-motion
Att: 3 (12/18/2015) Civil Cover Sheet