Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:William H Steele
Referred: Katherine P Nelson
Case #: 1:15-cv-00642
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2015
Terminated:Feb 03, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2016 4:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Taylor Golf Car Sales & Service, Inc.
20988 State Highway 59
Robertsdale, AL 36567
Represented By
Marion E. Wynne, Jr.
Wilkins, Bankester, Biles & Wynne
contact info
Plaintiff
Mr. Golf Carts, Inc.
310 Mills Road
Waynesboro, GA 30830
Represented By
Harry B. Mullen
Bryan, Nelson, Schroeder, Castigliola & Banahan, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Taylor
Terminated: 02/03/2016
Represented By
Marion E. Wynne, Jr.
Wilkins, Bankester, Biles & Wynne
contact info

GPO Dec 18 2015
Order directing plaintiff to obtain licensed counsel & file a notice of appearance by 1/18/2016. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/18/2015. Copy mailed to James Eastmead. (tgw)
GPO Dec 28 2016
Order: It appears that subject matter jurisdiction existed when the complaint was filed. If the defendant disagrees, it is ordered to file a brief by 1/3/2017. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/28/2016. (tgw)
GPO Jan 06 2017
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/6/2017. (tgw)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
58 58 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 02/06 1:36 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:57 Judgment, entered in favor of Mr. Golf Carts, Inc. against Taylor's Golf Car Sales & Service, Inc. by Mr. Golf Carts, Inc.. (Mullen, Harry)
Related: [-]