Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Indira Talwani
Case #: 1:15-cv-14118
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2015
Terminated:May 06, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 14, 2016 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Framingham Police Department
150 Concord Street
Framingham, MA 01702
Defendant
Town of Framingham
Plaintiff
Alec H. Fromberg
6 Claflin Street Apt A
Framingham, MA 01702

GPO May 06 2016
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. The Courts records indicate that plaintiff has not filed either a show cause reply or an amended complaint within the 35-day time period required by this Court. The complaint is dismissed, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), for the substantive reasons set forth in the February 8, 2016 Memorandum and Order. The Clerk mailed a copy of this Order to plaintiff at the address listed on the docket.(PSSA, 4)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2016
8 8 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/06 12:31 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE For the reasons stated in the Order dated May 6, 2016, this action is dismissed in its entirety pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. The clerk mailed a copy of this order to plaintiff at the address listed on the docket.(PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Fri 05/06 12:29 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. The Courts records indicate that plaintiff has not filed either a show cause reply or an amended complaint within the 35-day time period required by this Court. The complaint is dismissed, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), for the substantive reasons set forth in the February 8, 2016 Memorandum and Order. The Clerk mailed a copy of this Order to plaintiff at the address listed on the docket.(PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2016
6 6 utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/08 10:17 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response (or amended complaint) due by 3/14/2016. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/08 10:16 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing the Framingham Police Department as a defendant. The claims against the Town of Framingham will be dismissed unless, within 35 days of the date of this Order, the plaintiff shows good cause in writing why the claims against this defendant should not be dismissed, or files an amended complaint. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2015
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 12/21 10:30 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Halley, Taylor)
Related: [-]
3 3 order General Order 09-1 Mon 12/21 10:14 AM
General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/21 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Town of Framingham,Framingham Police Department, filed by Alec H. Fromberg.(Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet