Bedard v. SNAP Advances, LLC
New York Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Robert E Littlefield Jr |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-90056 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
SNAP Advances, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy P. Bedard
52 Choiniere Road
Rouses Point, NY 12979 |
Represented By
|
Trustee
Andrea E. Celli-Trustee
Chapter 13 Standing Trustee 7 Southwoods Boulevard
Albany, NY 12211 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 08/10 12:17 PM
Disposition of Adversary 1:15-ap-90056 . (Phillips, Traci-Michelle) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 08/10 1:14 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-90056 Closed. (Phillips, Traci-Michelle) |
||
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/10 3:07 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . (Schaaf, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 06/09 4:52 PM
Hearing Held; GRANTED; COURT TO PREPARE ORDER . (OConnell, Theresa) |
||
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
court
Court Certificate of Mailing
Fri 05/20 9:49 AM
Court Certificate of Mailing . (Phillips, Traci-Michelle) |
|
9 | 9
order
Show Cause
Fri 05/20 9:47 AM
Order to Appear and Show Cause For Dismissal of Case . Show Cause hearing to be held on 6/9/2016 at 09:15 AM at Albany CourtRoom. (Phillips, Traci-Michelle) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
court
Court Certificate of Mailing
Tue 03/15 3:20 PM
Court Certificate of Mailing . (Phillips, Traci-Michelle) |
|
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order (AP)
Tue 03/15 3:16 PM
Scheduling Order . Trial date set for 10/25/2016 at 09:30 AM at Albany CourtRoom. Discovery due by 6/15/2016. Dispositive Motions returnable on or before 8/25/2016. Pre-Trial Statements and Exhibits due by 10/14/2016.(See Order for Further Details) (Phillips, Traci-Michelle) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/09 1:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by SNAP Advances, LLC. (Wilkinson, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 12/22 11:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on SNAP Advances, LLC 12/22/2015 (McCann, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
court
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 12/22 11:12 AM
Notice of Deficiency sent to Thomas McCann . Document Correction due by 12/24/2015. (Schaaf, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 12/22 10:24 AM
Summons Issued on SNAP Advances, LLC Answer Due 01/21/2016 (McCann, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint(COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 12/22 10:24 AM
Adversary case 15-90056 1. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Randy P. Bedard against SNAP Advances, LLC. Fee is WAIVED. Plaintiff is the Debtor. (McCann, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet | ||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 12/22 11:10 AM
Judge Robert E. Littlefield, Jr. added to case. (Schaaf, Thomas) |