Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-42384

Missouri Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cynthia A Norton
Case #: 4:15-ap-04174
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2015
Terminated:Oct 26, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Eric Robert Heil
402 N. Thornton
Richmond, MO 64085
Represented By
Eric Robert Heil
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Leanne Heil
402 N. Thornton
Richmond, MO 64085
Represented By
Melissa Leanne Heil
contact info
Plaintiff
Agriland FS, Inc
421 N. 10th Street
Winterset, IA 50273
Represented By
James H. Worthington
Aull Sherman Worthington Giorza Hamilton
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Friday, November 04, 2016
26 26 audio Fri 11/04 9:40 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. CAUTION: PACER FEES APPLY ANYTIME AN AUDIO FILE IS ACCESSED. Court Date & Time [ 10/25/2016 3:06:28 AM ]. File Size [ 1931 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:01 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
25 25 epo Generic Order Wed 10/26 10:16 AM
Order of the Court Approving Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice. . It is so ORDERED by /s/ Cynthia A. Norton. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the epo category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Related [+] (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/26 1:06 PM
Disposition and Closing Adversary Proceeding Number 4:15-ap-4174. (Meador, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
24 24 notice Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/25 3:12 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice . (Worthington, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2016
23 23 audio Wed 10/12 4:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. CAUTION: PACER FEES APPLY ANYTIME AN AUDIO FILE IS ACCESSED. Court Date & Time [ 10/11/2016 2:49:24 AM ]. File Size [ 2690 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:36 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
22 22 court Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued Wed 10/12 1:30 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued regarding the Complaint and/or the Amended Complaint or agreed dismissal to be filed. Subject to this Court's Local Rules of Practice, General Orders and Administrative Procedures, a Witness List and Exhibit Index shall be filed and served not later than seven business days before the hearing. In addition to the exhibit index to be filed, complete exhibits shall be redacted, marked and filed in accordance with L.R. 7016-1 as attachments to the exhibit index. Failure to comply may result in exclusion of evidence at hearings. Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/25/2016 at 02:30 PM at Telephone Conference. (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
21 21 court Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued Wed 06/22 11:27 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued regarding the Complaint and/or the Amended Complaint - Formal discovery stayed pending further Court order. Subject to this Court's Local Rules of Practice, General Orders and Administrative Procedures, a Witness List and Exhibit Index shall be filed and served not later than seven business days before the hearing. In addition to the exhibit index to be filed, complete exhibits shall be redacted, marked and filed in accordance with L.R. 7016-1 as attachments to the exhibit index. Failure to comply may result in exclusion of evidence at hearings. Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/11/2016 at 02:30 PM at Telephone Conference. (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 1
20 20 audio Tue 06/21 4:10 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. CAUTION: PACER FEES APPLY ANYTIME AN AUDIO FILE IS ACCESSED. Court Date & Time [ 6/21/2016 2:36:12 AM ]. File Size [ 7089 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:46 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2016
19 19 court Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued Thu 05/12 11:30 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued regarding the Complaint and/or the Amended Complaint Subject to this Court's Local Rules of Practice, General Orders and Administrative Procedures, a Witness List and Exhibit Index shall be filed and served not later than three business days before the hearing. In addition to the exhibit index to be filed, complete exhibits shall be redacted, marked and filed in accordance with L.R. 7016-1 as attachments to the exhibit index. Failure to comply may result in exclusion of evidence at hearings. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/21/2016 at 02:30 PM at Telephone Conference. (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 1
18 18 audio Tue 05/10 4:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. CAUTION: PACER FEES APPLY ANYTIME AN AUDIO FILE IS ACCESSED. Court Date & Time [ 5/10/2016 2:55:47 AM ]. File Size [ 2322 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:50 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
16 16 audio Wed 03/02 4:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. CAUTION: PACER FEES APPLY ANYTIME AN AUDIO FILE IS ACCESSED. Court Date & Time [ 3/1/2016 1:48:29 PM ]. File Size [ 3115 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:29 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
17 17 court Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued Fri 03/04 1:18 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued regarding the Complaint and/or the Amended Complaint Subject to this Court's Local Rules of Practice, General Orders and Administrative Procedures, a Witness List and Exhibit Index shall be filed and served not later than three business days before the hearing. In addition to the exhibit index to be filed, complete exhibits shall be redacted, marked and filed in accordance with L.R. 7016-1 as attachments to the exhibit index. Failure to comply may result in exclusion of evidence at hearings. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/10/2016 at 02:30 PM at Telephone Conference. (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, February 29, 2016
15 15 court Pre-Trial Conference Held and Continued Mon 02/29 3:43 PM
Pre-Trial Conference rescheduled to an earlier time regarding the Complaint and/or the Amended Complaint Subject to this Court's Local Rules of Practice, General Orders and Administrative Procedures, a Witness List and Exhibit Index shall be filed and served not later than three business days before the hearing. In addition to the exhibit index to be filed, complete exhibits shall be redacted, marked and filed in accordance with L.R. 7016-1 as attachments to the exhibit index. Failure to comply may result in exclusion of evidence at hearings. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference reset for 3/1/2016 at 01:50 PM at Telephone Conference. (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, February 25, 2016
14 14 answer Response Thu 02/25 11:54 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Eric Robert Heil, Melissa Leanne Heil. Related [+] (Allen, Daniel) Modified on 2/26/2016 (Shannon, Kirsten)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
13 13 epo Continue Hearing Thu 02/25 1:43 PM
Order of the Court Granting the Motion to Continue Hearing on the Complaint and Objection to Debtors' Discharge of Debt. The trial scheduled for 3/2/2016 is cancelled. The trial setting will be discussed at the pretrial conference scheduled for 3/1/2016. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Cynthia A. Norton. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the epo category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Harden, Debra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
12 12 motion Continue Adversary Hearing Wed 02/24 1:30 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Complaint & Objection to Debtors' Discharge of Debt . filed by Agriland FS, Inc. (Worthington, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2016
11 11 epo Continue Trial Mon 02/01 11:59 AM
Order of the Court Continuing the Pretrial Conference. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Cynthia A. Norton . Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/1/2016 at 02:30 PM at Telephone Conference. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the epo category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Related [+] (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 epo Extend Time Mon 02/01 11:54 AM
Order of the Court Granting the Motion to Extend Time to file response to the Complaint. Pretrial conference is canceled and will be rescheduled. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Cynthia A. Norton Miscellaneous Deadline: 2/25/2016. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the epo category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Related [+] (McAdams, Jamie)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, January 26, 2016
9 9 motion Extend Time Tue 01/26 10:41 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Petition. Extension requested to February 25, 2016. filed by Eric Robert Heil, Melissa Leanne Heil. (Allen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 advother Entry of Appearance Tue 01/26 10:40 PM
Entry of Appearance Daniel L. Allen by Eric and Melissa Heil. (Allen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2015
7 7 advother Certificate of Service Mon 12/28 1:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Trial in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Agriland FS, Inc. (Worthington, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2015
6 6 court Summons Issued Tue 12/22 3:17 PM
Summons Issued 12/22/2015 on Defendant(s) Eric Robert Heil , Melissa Leanne Heil . Attorney for Plaintiff to Serve Summons and File a Certificate of Service. NOTE: The Summons is only effective for a period of 14 days after its issuance. Service made after that date is ineffective. Service must be made in accordance with the provisions of Rule 7004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Failure to certify that service was effected within the time and in the manner required may lead to denial of a request for judgment by default. . (Harden, Debra)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Pretrial Order Tue 12/22 3:17 PM
Pretrial Order. Attorney for Plaintiff is Directed to Serve the SUMMONS and PRETRIAL ORDER and File a Certificate of Service. Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/16/2016 at 02:30 PM at Telephone Conference. Trial date set for 3/2/2016 at 02:30 PM at US Courthouse, Courtroom 6A, 400 E. 9th St., Kansas City, MO. Related [+] (Harden, Debra)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 court Court Certificate of Service - text Tue 12/22 3:13 PM
Court's Certificate of Service to Eric Robert Heil Melissa Leanne Heil 402 N. Thornton Richmond, MO 64085 on 12/22/2015 Related [+] (Harden, Debra)
Related: [-] 3 Notice re Pro Bono Litigation Project and Application
3 3 court Notice re Pro Bono Litigation - Defendant Tue 12/22 3:12 PM
Notice re Pro Bono Litigation Project - A lawsuit has been started against you. You have been or will be served with a Summons and Complaint. If the plaintiff is successful, or you do not respond in time, you could end up either owing money to the plaintiff or having your discharge denied or revoked. The Court shall serve a copy of this Notice on parties not receiving electronic notification . (Harden, Debra)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2015
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card or Direct Debit Mon 12/21 4:21 PM
Receipt for Complaint 15-04174 can) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), with receipt number 13084483, in the amount of 350.00 dollars. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/21 4:17 PM
Adversary case 15-04174 Complaint by Agriland FS, Inc against Eric Robert Heil, Melissa Leanne Heil. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee of $350.00 today. The Nature of Suit for this Complaint is: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Worthington, James)
Related: [-]