Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as v. Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-01431 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
48
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 11/01 10:33 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 7/14/2016 10:06AM RE: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Portions of the Amended Adversary Complaint filed by Rishi Zutshi on Am behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/19/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/28/2016. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/21/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/19/2017. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
misc
Adversary Closed
Fri 08/26 10:01 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1431 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/25 5:22 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Amar-Dolan, Jeremy) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Reply
Fri 05/27 6:54 PM
Reply to Motion / Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff filed by Rishi Zutshi on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Zutshi, Rishi) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 05/16 2:38 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Governing the Production of Confidential Materials signed on 5/16/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Fri 05/13 7:05 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation and Order Governing the Production of Confidential Materials filed by Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Amar-Dolan, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/09 3:24 PM
Stipulated Joint Pretrial Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan signed on 5/9/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Fri 05/06 5:55 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Joint Pretrial Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan filed by Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Amar-Dolan, Jeremy) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/06 4:58 PM
Stipulation Notice and Stipulation of Amendment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) Filed by Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Amar-Dolan, Jeremy) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Opposition Brief
Fri 04/29 9:47 PM
Opposition Brief Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Amar-Dolan, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
57
pgs
misc
Transcript
Mon 04/11 4:10 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/29/2016 10:00AM RE: Pre-Trial Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/28/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/6/2016. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/2/2016. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/28/2016. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 03/29 5:19 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement , dated March 29, 2016. . Corporate parents added to case: Daiwa Securities Group Inc.. Corporate Affiliates added to case:, Harris Associates L.P.. Filed by Rishi Zutshi on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Zutshi, Rishi) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
21
pgs
answer
Memorandum of Law
Mon 03/21 8:57 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Strike filed by Rishi Zutshi on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Zutshi, Rishi) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Declaration
Mon 03/21 8:56 PM
Declaration of Rishi Zutshi, dated March 21, 2016, in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Strike filed by Rishi Zutshi on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Zutshi, Rishi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
12 | 12
motion
Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/21 8:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or, in the Alternative, to Strike Certain Portions of the Amended Adversary Complaint filed by Rishi Zutshi on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Zutshi, Rishi) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/21 8:41 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Elizabeth M. Hanly on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Hanly, Elizabeth) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/21 8:39 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Rishi Zutshi on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Zutshi, Rishi) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/21 8:36 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Thomas J. Moloney on behalf of Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd.. (Moloney, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Mon 03/21 12:06 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Granting Substitution of Counsel and Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice signed on 3/21/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Substitution of Attorney
Fri 03/18 11:34 AM
Notice of Substitution of Attorney for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. from Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP to Jones Day filed by Jeremy Michael Amar-Dolan on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Amar-Dolan, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 03/07 6:09 PM
Affidavit of Service of Carol Zhang of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/04 5:47 PM
Amended Complaint against Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc. Filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) |
|
4 | 4
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 03/04 3:08 PM
So Ordered Stipulation re: Service & Response of Complaint signed on 3/4/2016 (White, Greg) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 02/19 4:40 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing : Notice of Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference filed by Ralph I. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/29/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Miller, Ralph) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 12/23 4:41 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/23/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC), Answer due by 1/22/2016, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 12/23 4:26 PM
Adversary case 15-01431 Complaint against Daiwa Securities Capital Markets Co. Ltd. . Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., in its capacity as Plan Administrator on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 12/23 4:28 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-01431 scc) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11063755. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |