Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-14534

Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Phyllis M Jones
Case #: 2:15-ap-01118
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 28, 2015
Terminated:Aug 03, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Martha South
255 CR 652
Wynne, AR 72396
Represented By
Martha South
contact info
Plaintiff
First National Bank of Omaha
1620 Dodge Street, Stop 3105
Omaha, NE 68197
Represented By
Cory J. Rooney
Brumbaugh & Quandahl, Pc Llo
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/03 11:21 AM
Adversary Case 2:15-ap-1118 Closed. (Johnson, LaTrese)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 26, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 06/26 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/26/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Default Judgment of Nondischargeability. Judgment Entered Against Martha South In Favor of First National Bank of Omaha For the Amount of $7,170.14, plus the filing fee of $350.00 for a total of $7,520.14, plus interest from the date of the bankruptcy filing. (RE: related document(s) 1, 10) Entered on 6/24/2016(Johnson, LaTrese)
Friday, June 24, 2016
16 16 order Judgment Fri 06/24 4:51 PM
Default Judgment of Nondischargeability. Judgment Entered Against Martha South In Favor of First National Bank of Omaha For the Amount of $7,170.14, plus the filing fee of $350.00 for a total of $7,520.14, plus interest from the date of the bankruptcy filing. Related [+] Entered on 6/24/2016(Johnson, LaTrese)
Related: [-] 1, 10
Friday, June 03, 2016
15 15 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Fri 06/03 1:49 PM
Hearing Scheduled For 6/7/16 CANCELLED. JUDGE REVIEWED, BURTON STACY TO SUBMIT ORDER GRANTING Related [+] (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Burton E. Stacy Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
Thursday, April 07, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Thu 04/07 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)10 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Burton E. Stacy Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha) Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at Helena Division.
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
13 13 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 04/05 9:31 AM
Hearing SCHEDULE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/7/2016 at 10:00 AM at Helena Division. (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Burton E. Stacy Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
12 12 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Tue 04/05 9:30 AM
DISREGARD, SET WRONG DATE (DELETED BNC)Hearing SCHEDULE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2016 at 10:00 AM at Helena Division. (Mansfield, MaryBeth) Modified on 4/5/2016 (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Burton E. Stacy Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
11 11 court Hearing (Document) Not Held Tue 04/05 9:29 AM
STATUS Hearing Scheduled For 4/14/16 CANCELLED. MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT FILED Prior to the Hearin Related [+] (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:15-ap-01118. Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Martha South.
Thursday, March 31, 2016
10 10 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/31 12:26 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Burton E. Stacy Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha Related [+] (Stacy, Burton)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B Part 1
Att: 3 Exhibit B Part 2
Thursday, March 10, 2016
9 9 misc Document (Misc. Items ONLY i.e. Power of Attorney, Death Certificate, Ballots, etc.) Thu 03/10 10:07 AM
Miscellaneous Document Affidavit of Non Military Service Filed by Burton E. Stacy Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha. (Stacy, Burton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/10 10:03 AM
Summons Service Executed on Martha South (Stacy, Burton)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2016
7 7 misc Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/04 3:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Burton E. Stacy Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff First National Bank of Omaha. (Stacy, Burton)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Wed 03/02 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearin Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Status hearing SCHEDULED(RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 2:15-ap-01118. Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Martha South. ) Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2016 at 10:00 AM at Helena Division.
Monday, February 29, 2016
5 5 court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched Mon 02/29 10:29 AM
Status hearing SCHEDULE Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2016 at 10:00 AM at Helena Division. (Mansfield, MaryBeth)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:15-ap-01118. Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Martha South.
Tuesday, December 29, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/29 10:20 AM
Summons Service Executed on Martha South (Rooney, Cory)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2015
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 12/28 11:53 AM
RECEIPT of Complaint(2:15-ap-01118) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. receipt number 10963271, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 12/28 11:52 AM
Summons Issued on Martha South Answer Due 01/27/2016 (Rooney, Cory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp complaint - COURT USE ONLY Mon 12/28 11:52 AM
Adversary case 2:15-ap-01118. Complaint by First National Bank of Omaha against Martha South. Fee Amount Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (65 (Dischargeability - other)) (Rooney, Cory)
Related: [-]