Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:James E Gritzner
Referred: Stephen B Jackson, Jr
Case #: 4:15-cv-00479
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2015
Terminated:May 14, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Jun 26, 2016 5:01 AM CDT
Defendant
JOHN Q. HAMMONS HOTELS, INC.
Represented By
LARY IRA ZUCKER
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Corporations, 1-10
Defendant
Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Allen Schultheis
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Lary Ira Zucker
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Katie Lynn Graham
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Defendant
Embassy Suites, Inc.
Defendant
Embassy Suites Management, LLC
Represented By
Mark Allen Schultheis
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Lary Ira Zucker
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Katie Lynn Graham
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Defendant
Embassy Suites Franchise, LLC
Represented By
Mark Allen Schultheis
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Lary Ira Zucker
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Katie Lynn Graham
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Amanda Marie Atherton
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Defendant
Atrium TRS III, LP
Represented By
Mark Allen Schultheis
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Lary Ira Zucker
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Katie Lynn Graham
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Q. Hammons Hotels, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Allen Schultheis
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Lary Ira Zucker
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Katie Lynn Graham
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Defendant
John Q. Hammons Hotels Management, LLC
Represented By
Mark Allen Schultheis
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
LARY IRA ZUCKER
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Lary Ira Zucker
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Katie Lynn Graham
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Amanda Marie Atherton
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS, 1-10
Defendant
Hilton Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By
Mark Allen Schultheis
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
LARY IRA ZUCKER
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Lary Ira Zucker
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Katie Lynn Graham
Nyemaster Goode PC
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Defendant
HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By
LARY IRA ZUCKER
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Defendant
HAMMONS, INC.
Represented By
BERNARD J. TKACZYNSKI
Law Offices William E. Staehle
contact info
Defendant
EMBASSY SUITES, INC.
Defendant
EMBASSY SUITES MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By
LARY IRA ZUCKER
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Defendant
EMBASSY SUITES FRANCHISE, LLC
Represented By
LARY IRA ZUCKER
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Defendant
ATRIUM TRS III, LP
Represented By
LARY IRA ZUCKER
Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheri Marchionda
Represented By
Paul D. Brandes
Villari Brandes & Giannone, P.C.
contact info
Michael Albert Hanamirian
The Hanamirian Firm
contact info
Frederick W James
The James Law Firm P.C.
contact info
Peter Michael Villari
Villari Brandes & Giannone, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
CHERI MARCHIONDA
Represented By
MICHAEL ALBERT HANAMIRIAN
The Hanamirian Firm, P.C.
contact info
PAUL D. BRANDES
Villari Brandes & Giannone, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hammons, Inc.
Terminated: 02/23/2016
Represented By
J. Scott Bardole
Law Office Of Daniel P. Hanson
contact info
James W. Bryan
Law Office Of Daniel P. Hanson
contact info
Bernard J. Tkaczynski
Law Offices William E. Staehle
contact info
M. Alan Holcomb
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Mark R. Johnson
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info
Frederick J. Sager, Jr.
Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/14 1:05 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per512 Stipulation. (sjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
512 512 misc Stipulation Mon 05/13 1:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal per FRCP 41 by Cheri Marchionda. (Brandes, Paul)
Related: [-]