California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:10-cv-03419
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2010
Terminated:Dec 14, 2010
Defendant
Arrindell Real Estate Appraisal Services
Defendant
Fidelity National Title Company
Defendant
IndyMac Federal Bank FSB
Defendant
Indymac Mortgage Services A Division of OneWest Bank, FSB
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Defendant
MTC Financial Inc.
Defendant
Real Estate Financial Services Inc
Plaintiff
Marco A. Gutierrez

GPO Sep 01 2010
ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
GPO Sep 09 2010
ORDER RE:8 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/10. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.