Consolidated
Lead case: 3:15-md-02672

California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:15-cv-06278
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2015
Terminated:Jul 21, 2020
Case in other court:New Jersey, 2:15-cv-07582
Last checked: Sunday Jun 26, 2016 2:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Audi of America Inc
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
In Re
Volkswagen "Clean Diesel" Cases
Plaintiff
DEBRA J. HUNTER
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER J. MCGINN
Law Office Of Christopher J. Mcginn
contact info
MATTHEW SCOTT OORBEEK
The Wolf Law Firm LLC
contact info
Matthew Scott Oorbeek
The Wolf Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NINA SEIGELSTEIN
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER J. MCGINN
Law Office Of Christopher J. Mcginn
contact info
MATTHEW SCOTT OORBEEK
The Wolf Law Firm LLC
contact info
Matthew Scott Oorbeek
The Wolf Law Firm LLC
contact info

GPO Jan 21 2016
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Government Coordinating Counsel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 21, 2016. (crblc4S COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, August 10, 2020
utility MDL Member Case Closed Mon 08/10 12:31 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 7/21/2020 in the MDL 2672 master file (dkt. #7629), civil case no. 3:15-cv-06278-CRB is terminated. cc: JPMDL (elyS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2016
10 10 11 pgs misc Transcript Mon 11/07 9:29 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/03/2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda)
Related: [-] (2151 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (2146 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order
Thursday, March 24, 2016
9 9 misc Transcript Thu 03/24 12:59 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/16, before Judge Breyer. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509;pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 4/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2016. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
Related: [-] (1382 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1366 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order, (1380 in 3:15-md-02672-CRB) Transcript Order
Thursday, January 21, 2016
8 8 order 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 01/21 5:03 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Government Coordinating Counsel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 21, 2016. (crblc4S COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2015
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 12/30 3:29 PM
Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:15-cv-07582. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
6 6 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of California. (ek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
5 5 LETTER ORDER consolidating the listed cases for all pretrial purposes; consolidating all cases filed prospectively that similarly assert claims for fraud, breach of warranty, violation of consumer protection/consumer fraud statutes and/or RICO; that all pleadings, motions, and other documents hereafter filed by any of the parties in connection with any of these consolidated cases shall bear the caption, "In re: Volkswagen "Clean Diesel" Cases" and shall bear Case No. 15-7012 ; that all pleadings, motions and other documents filed by Pltfs shall be filed by Interim Co-Liaison Counsel on behalf of said Pltfs; granting in part VW's Motion to Stay (Civil Action No. 15-7012 ECF No. 22); that this matter is stayed with respect to VW's obligation to file responsive pleadings or other motions, pending the determination by the JPMDL of a pending Motion for Transfer and Centralization; that VW shall file a submission by 11/3/2015, and the Court shall hear oral argument on 11/12/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5D with respect to Pltfs' Proposed OTSC (Civil Action No. 15-7012 ECF No. 4). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/22/2015.(gxh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference held on 10/20/2015. (Court Reporter/Recorder phyllis t. lewis.) (lr, )
Related: [-]
3 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2015
2 2 LETTER ORDER appointing James E. Cecchi and Christopher A. Seeger as Interim Co-Liaison Counsel to act on behalf of the Plaintiffs and the putative Class with responsibilities set forth in this order and this order shall apply to, and be docketed in each action arising out of the same or substantially similar facts as alleged in these actions subsequently filed in or transferred to the USDC for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/6/15. (cm )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against AUDI OF AMERICA, INC., VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6706947) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NINA SEIGELSTEIN, DEBRA J. HUNTER.(cm )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet