Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-13576

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01003
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2016
Terminated:Sep 14, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Daniel Fiocca
2319 Pasqua Trail
League City, TX 77573
Represented By
Daniel Fiocca
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert A. Angueira
6495 SW 24th St
Miami, FL 33155
Represented By
Yanay Galban
contact info
Rachel L Ahlum
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Tue 10/11 7:45 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by CG. Receipt Number 312902. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/14 10:11 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1003 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Mon 08/08 11:30 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Robert A. Angueira. (Galban, Yanay)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 16, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 07/17 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 07/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Granting Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Yanay Galban Substituted for Attorney Rachel L Ahlum as Counsel. (Re:8 )
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
9 9 order Substitute Attorney Order Wed 07/13 9:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Yanay Galban Substituted for Attorney Rachel L Ahlum as Counsel. Related [+] (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] #8
Monday, July 11, 2016
8 8 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 07/11 3:17 PM
Agreed Motion To Substitute Attorney Yanay Galban for Attorney Rachel L. Ahlum. Filed by Plaintiff Robert A. Angueira. (Galban, Yanay)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/02 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/01/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Agreed Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: (1 Complaint). Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Wednesday, March 30, 2016
6 6 order Continue Hearing Order Wed 03/30 11:27 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion To Continue Hearing On: (1 Complaint). Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/07/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2016
5 5 motion Continue Hearing Tue 03/29 1:09 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] Filed by Plaintiff Robert A. Angueira (Ahlum, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 01/06 11:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on Daniel Fiocca 1/6/2016 Filed by Plaintiff Robert A. Angueira, Defendant Daniel Fiocca. (Ahlum, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 01/05 4:25 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 01/05 4:22 PM
Summons Issued on Daniel Fiocca Answer Due 2/4/2016 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/06/2016 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert A. Angueira
Monday, January 04, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/04 10:47 AM
Adversary case 16-01003 Complaint by Robert A. Angueira against Daniel Fiocca. Filing Fee in the Amount of 350.00, Deferred. Nature of Suit:,(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Ahlum, Rachel)
Related: [-]