Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Laurie J Michelson
Referred: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Case #: 2:16-cv-10006
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2016
Terminated:Jan 15, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jul 02, 2016 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Audi AG
Defendant
Porsche AG
Defendant
Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Defendant
Volkswagen AG
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations LLC
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff
Center for Auto Safety
Intervening Plaintiff, Center for Auto Safety et al 1825 Connecticut Ave NW Suite 330
Washington, DC 20009
Represented By
Jaye Quadrozzi
Young & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Bethany Engel
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Josh H. Van Eaton
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


1. U.S. Sues Volkswagen Over Emissions Scandal (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 01/05/2016
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, February 02, 2016
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed - 90 Day Tue 02/02 12:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Porsche AG waiver sent on 1/5/2016, answer due 4/4/2016. (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Tue 02/02 12:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Porsche Cars North America, Inc. waiver sent on 1/5/2016, answer due 3/7/2016. (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2016
misc Docket Annotation Thu 01/21 2:31 PM
Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:16-cv-00295, filed 01/19/2016. (VLun)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
12 12 1 pgs notice Notice - Other Fri 01/15 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of California for MDL 2672. (SSch)
Related: [-]
11 11 order MDL Transfer Order - Transfer Out Fri 01/15 1:31 PM
MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14) to Northern District of California for MDL # 2672. (SSch)
Related: [-]
10 10 order MDL Transfer Order - Transfer Out Fri 01/15 10:06 AM
MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14) for MDL # 2672. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Fri 01/15 1:34 PM
Case transferred to Northern District of California. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Fri 01/08 11:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America Chattanooga Operations LLC waiver sent on 1/5/2016, answer due 3/7/2016. (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Fri 01/08 11:58 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. waiver sent on 1/5/2016, answer due 3/7/2016. (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 90 Day Fri 01/08 11:57 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Audi AG waiver sent on 1/5/2016, answer due 4/4/2016. (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed - 90 Day Fri 01/08 11:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Volkswagen AG waiver sent on 1/5/2016, answer due 4/4/2016. (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
5 5 notice Appearance Tue 01/05 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Josh H. Van Eaton on behalf of United States of America. (Van Eaton, Josh)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order Tue 01/05 4:02 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis pursuant to Administrative Order. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2016
4 4 motion Intervene Mon 01/04 9:00 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Center for Auto Safety. (Quadrozzi, Jaye)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Proposed Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Proposed Complaint
3 3 service Summons Issued* Mon 01/04 4:00 PM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - Other Mon 01/04 1:07 PM
NOTICE by United States of America (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 01/04 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: USA - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Northern District of California, 3:15-md-02672, Judge Honorable Charles R. Breyer ] (Engel, Bethany)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 01/04 3:51 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra)
Related: [-]