Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julie A Manning
Case #: 5:07-bk-50727
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2007
Creditor Meeting:Jun 23, 2008
Claims Deadline:Apr 07, 2008
Terminated:Jan 30, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Apr 03, 2009

Debtor
Reunion Industries, Inc.
11 Stanwix Street - Suite 1400
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Derek M. Johnson
The Law Offices Of Derek M. Johnson LLC
contact info
Carol A. Felicetta
Reid And Riege, P.C.
contact info
David M. S. Shaiken
Shipman, Shaiken & Schwefel, LLC
contact info
Eric A. Henzy
Reid And Riege, P.C.
contact info
Debtor
Charles E. Bradley, Sr. Family Limited Partnership
One Stamford Landing 62 Southfield Avenue
Stamford, CT 06902
Represented By
Carol A. Felicetta
Reid And Riege, P.C.
contact info
Eric A. Henzy
Reid And Riege, P.C.
contact info
Debtor
John Grier Poole Family Limited Partnership
c/o One Rye Road
Port Chester, NY 10573
Represented By
Carol A. Felicetta
Reid And Riege, P.C.
contact info
Eric A. Henzy
Reid And Riege, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
Steven E. Mackey
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, January 30, 2017
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/30 12:24 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Waterbury, Susan)
Related: [-]