North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catharine R Aron
Case #: 6:12-bk-50121
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2012
Terminated:Mar 11, 2015

Debtor
Lexington Road Properties, Inc.
500 Battery Dr
Winston Salem, NC 27107-4137
Represented By
William B. Sullivan
contact info
Jennifer Barker Lyday
Womble, Carlyle, Sandridge, & Rice, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Bankruptcy Administrator
Michael D. West
Bankruptcy Administrator P.O. Box 1828
Greensboro, NC 27402
Trustee
W. Joseph Burns
Trustee P.O. Box 21433
Winston-Salem, NC 27120
Represented By
W. Joseph Burns
contact info

Docket last updated: 02/09/2013 9:50 PM EST
Friday, January 27, 2012
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-50121 [misc,volp11] (1046.00). Receipt number 3887944, amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1046 Filed by Lexington Road Properties, Inc. Court enters deficiencies (Sullivan, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Lexington Road Properties, Inc.. (Sullivan, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Resolution Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Debtor Lexington Road Properties, Inc.. (Sullivan, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 Application to Employ William B. Sullivan and Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP as Bankruptcy Attorneys Filed by Debtor Lexington Road Properties, Inc. (Sullivan, William) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2012 (Holbrook, D.).
Related: [-]
5 5 Proposed Order Filed by Debtor Lexington Road Properties, Inc. Related [+]. (Sullivan, William)
Related: [-] 4 Application to Employ William B. Sullivan and Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP as Bankruptcy Attorneys
6 6 Support Document Verified Statement in Support of Debtor's Application to Employ Bankruptcy Attorneys Filed by Attorney William B. Sullivan Related [+]. (Sullivan, William)
Related: [-] 4 Application to Employ William B. Sullivan and Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP as Bankruptcy Attorneys
7 7 Verification of Creditor Matrix , Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Lexington Road Properties, Inc.. (Sullivan, William)
Related: [-]