Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 3:10-cv-00734
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2010
Terminated:Jan 03, 2012
Counter Defendant
Robert Richmond
Counter Plaintiff
Barry Brooks
Counter Plaintiff
Centurion Exteriors, Inc.
Counter Plaintiff
John Baugh
Defendant
Barry Brooks
Defendant
Centurion Exteriors, Inc.
Defendant
John Baugh
Plaintiff
Robert Richmond

GPO Aug 03 2010
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.01(e)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d), discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 8/3/10. (dt)
GPO Sep 30 2010
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 3/28/2011. Discovery due by 5/6/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2011. Telephone Conference set for 1/18/2011 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/30/10. (dt)
GPO Oct 06 2010
ORDER: Richmond's Motion To Dismiss Counterclaim 11 is hereby GRANTED and Defendants' counterclaim is hereby DISMISSED for failure to state a claimunder Rule 12(b)(6). The case is returned to the Magistrate Judge for case management under the Initial Case Management Order entered on 9/30/2010 16. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/6/10. (dt)
GPO Jan 18 2011
ORDER: Telephone conference held on 1/18/2011. As an initial matter, the Magistrate Judge discussed with the parties a discovery issue concerning questions about the Defendant's criminal record, including arrests. The parties agree with the Magistrate Judge that juvenile records are not involved in this inquiry. Because of counsels' schedules they have requested certain modifications to the scheduling order 16. Discovery deadline is reset for 6/30/2011. Dispositive Motions deadline is reset for 8/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 1/18/11. (dt)
GPO Jul 06 2011
ORDER: A telephone conference was held at the request of the parties during the discovery deposition of Defendant John Baugh on 7/5/2011. The Magistrate Judge is of the view that Mr. Baugh does need to state whether or not he is a majority stockholder in the parent company which wholly owns the Defendant Centurion Exteriors, Inc. If he is a majority stockholder, the Magistrate Judge does not see the need to delve into other stockholders' names and ownership percentages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/6/11. (dt)
GPO Jul 22 2011
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/22/11. (dt)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.