Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. et al v. Mission Product Holdings, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11400
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-11400
New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Michael Deasy |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01001 |
Nature of Suit | 71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mission Product Holdings, Inc.
60 East 42nd St., Suite 810
New York, NY 10165 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C.
P.O. Box 4430
Manchester, NH 03108 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Old Cold, LLC
100 Market Street Suite 202
Portsmouth, NH 03801 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
1000 Elm Street Suite 605
Manchester, NH 03101 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
court|utility
Close Adversary Proceeding (AP)|Disposition of Adversary
Thu 01/23 3:15 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed 16-1001 Disposition of Adversary Notice of Dismissal. (dcs) |
||
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding -Rule 7041
Fri 01/17 11:26 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. (Candon, Christopher) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Supplemental Document
Fri 01/10 11:21 PM
Supplemental Document Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. (Candon, Christopher) |
|
Friday, December 13, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Sat 12/14 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 11, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Thu 12/12 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/11/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
Directing
Wed 12/11 12:13 PM
Order Directing counsel to plaintiff to file either a status report, a stipulation of dismissal or a motion seeking dismissal of the above captioned adversary proceeding, consolidation with ADV 18-1026 or other relief as may be appropriate on or before January 10, 2020. Signed on 12/10/2019 (dcs) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
order
Status Hearing
Mon 12/09 11:22 AM
Order Setting a Status Hearing Signed on 12/9/2019 Status hearing to be held on 12/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at Worcester Courtroom, Donohue Federal Bldg & Courthouse, 595 Main Street, Courtroom 3, Worcester MA. (dcs) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 06/27 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/26/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
order
Directing
Mon 06/24 10:09 AM
Order Directing Mission to file a motion to amend its complaint on or before August 16, 2019. See order for further details. Signed on 6/24/2019 . Status hearing held. (dcs) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing AP
Fri 06/14 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
court
Hearing Set (BNC NOTICE) (AP)
Tue 06/11 10:04 AM
Telephonic Status Hearing Scheduled . Telephonic Status hearing to be held on 6/20/2019 at 02:00 PM at Boston Courtroom, McCormack Post Office & Court House, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA. Parties shall contact the courtroom deputy at 603-222-2685 for dial in instructions and access code. (mbs) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
notice
GENERIC Notice
Wed 05/22 10:26 AM
Status Report re: Notice of Stay of Certain Matters - Second Joint Status Report Concerning Stay of Certain Matters Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc.(Milne, Lindsay) Modified on 5/22/2019 to add docket text(dcs) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
GENERIC Report
Tue 01/22 10:12 AM
Report of - Joint Status Report Concerning Stay of Certain Matters Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc., Plaintiffs Old Cold, LLC, Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. (Tilsley, Roy) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Notice of Substitution of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 08/24 4:22 PM
Notice of Substitution of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel P. Keenan. Daniel P. Keenan has withdrawn. Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Keenan, Daniel) |
|
Sunday, May 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Mon 05/28 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/27/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
GENERIC Order
Fri 05/25 2:18 PM
Order Approving Stipulated Order Concerning Stay of Certain Matters. Until such time as the Court holds a status conference or orders otherwise, all pending or applicable deadlines in the Stayed Matters pending before this Court shall remain stayed, including any and all discovery. The parties shall file a brief report every 120 days advising the Court as to the status of the appeal. Signed on 5/25/2018 (cac) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 05/19 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Directing
Wed 05/16 11:28 AM
Order, Status Conference held, Order Directing Parties to File Proposed Order Signed on 5/16/2018 (jtp) |
|
Saturday, March 31, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing AP
Sun 04/01 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/31/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
court
Hearing Set (BNC Noticing Only)
Thu 03/29 10:18 AM
Status Hearing Scheduled . Case Management Conference to be held on 5/16/2018 at 10:00 AM at Worcester Courtroom, Donohue Federal Bldg & Courthouse, 595 Main Street, Courtroom 3, Worcester MA. (mbs) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 10/31 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel Keenan Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Keenan, Daniel) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal
Mon 10/30 1:07 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney by Michael A. Klass Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. Party has until 11/20/2017 to respond to the Court's Mailing of the Notice of Entry of Withdrawal. (Klass, Michael) |
|
Sunday, September 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Mon 09/18 12:48 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Reassigning Case
Fri 09/15 3:06 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Christopher J. Panos added to case. Involvement of Judge J. Michael Deasy ended Signed on 9/15/2017 (jtp) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 02/06 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/05/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
GENERIC Order
Wed 02/03 9:48 AM
Order; By agreement of the parties, All Matters Pending in this Adversary Proceeding are Stayed pursuant to the terms of the Stipulated Order entered in the main case on February 3, 2016. Signed on 2/3/2016 (jtp) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 01/26 2:58 PM
Hearing Held on 1/26/2016. Parties to file proposed standstill order . Proposed Order due on or before 2/4/2016. (mbs) |
||
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/25 12:51 PM
Certificate of Service related to the Objection of Mission Product Holdings, Inc. to Motion of the Debtor and Schleicher & Stebbins Hotel L.L.C. for Injunctive Relief Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Klass, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
23
pgs
notice
Memorandum of Law
Mon 01/25 12:46 PM
Memorandum of Law Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Klass, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Entire Proceeding)
Mon 01/25 12:43 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2, 1000 Elm Street, 11th Floor, Manchester, NH. (Klass, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Hearing | ||
13 | 13
answer
Objection
Mon 01/25 11:45 AM
Objection of Mission Product Holdings, Inc. to Motion of the Debtor and Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels L.L.C. for Injunctive Relief Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Klass, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Expedite Hearing
Tue 01/19 1:49 PM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing Signed on 1/19/2016. Hearing scheduled for 1/26/2016 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2, 1000 Elm Street, 11th Floor, Manchester, NH. (jtp) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 01/19 11:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael A. Klass Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Klass, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 01/19 11:32 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert J. Keach Filed by Defendant Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Keach, Robert) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/14 5:22 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. (Candon, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Expedite Hearing
Thu 01/14 4:47 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Plaintiff Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. (Candon, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 01/14 4:41 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed by Plaintiff Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. (Candon, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, January 09, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)
Sun 01/10 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/09/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 01/08 12:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mission Product Holdings, Inc. 1/7/2016 . (Candon, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Thu 01/07 10:51 AM
Summons Issued on Attorney Christopher M. Candon, Esq. to be served on Mission Product Holdings, Inc. Date Issued 1/7/2016, Answer Due 2/8/2016 . Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/23/2016 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2, 1000 Elm Street, 11th Floor, Manchester, NH. (jtp) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 01/07 10:21 AM
Amended Complaint Signed Version by Old Cold, LLC, Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. against Mission Product Holdings, Inc. (Candon, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Amended | ||
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 01/06 5:28 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-01001 JMD) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 3036923, Fee amount $ 350.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/06 5:27 PM
Adversary case 16-01001 Complaint of the Debtor and Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels L.L.C. Seeking Extension of Automatic Stay Under 11 U.S.C. Section 362(a) and for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 105(a) by Old Cold, LLC, Schleicher & Stebbins Hotels, L.L.C. against Mission Product Holdings, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350. (71 (Injunctive relief - imposition of stay)) (Candon, Christopher) Modified on 1/7/2016 to correct party filer(jtp). |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |